Credit Consultative, Inc. v. XL Insurance America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Credit Consultative, Inc. doing business as Franchisee (#18734) of H&R Block, Inc.
Defendant: XL Insurance America Inc.
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 1:2024cv05487
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 in Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr., Esq. dated September 11, 2024 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by XL Insurance America Inc...(Dwyer, Gerald)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (va)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29828386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Credit Consultative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Freiberg, Peter)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29828386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion to Continue.Plaintiff's August 27, 2024 request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference, Dkt. No. 18, is granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 29, 2024 is adjourned to September 18, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's July 19, 2024 order are due no later than September 11, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 18. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/28/2024) (jca)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Peter N. Freiberg dated August 27, 2024. Document filed by Credit Consultative, Inc...(Freiberg, Peter)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Credit Consultative, Inc...(Freiberg, Peter)
July 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Parker Dwyer, Jr on behalf of XL Insurance America Inc...(Dwyer, Gerald)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/29/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/19/2024) (rro)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:24-cv-01105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vba)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS granting #9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/18/2024.(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that XL Insurance's #7 Motion to Opt-Out of the Streamlined Settlement Program is GRANTED IN PART to the extent necessary for Defendant to prosecute its pending motion to transfer venue. If that motion is denied or the case otherwise remains on the docket, it will remain subject to the Hurricane Ida CMO and the Streamlined Settlement Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/12/2024. (alm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case . Signature block on pleading contains the name of an attorney who is not enrolled in this matter, Kevin Walsh. A motion to enroll and order is required to enroll. Any future pleadings containing the signature of an attorney not enrolled in this matter will not be accepted. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by XL Insurance America, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/6/2024 (cs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Response to Order to Show Cause: Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action is necessary. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION To Opt Out of the Streamlined Settlement Program by XL Insurance America, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Knighton, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by XL Insurance America, Inc. re #4 Directive of the Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Additional State Court Pleadings)(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/17/2024 (ko). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/2/2024.(mmv) (J. Fallon, Case Mgr, MJ Currault) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DIRECTIVE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, case number 197900 Div. E (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BLAEDC-10509707) filed by XL Insurance America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" - Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit "B" - Settlement Letter, #4 Exhibit "C" - PCG Estimate, #5 Exhibit "D" - State Court Record) Attorney Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr added to party XL Insurance America, Inc.(pty:dft).(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/1/2024 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Credit Consultative, Inc. v. XL Insurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr.
Represented By: Virginia Y. Dodd
Represented By: Gerald Parker Dwyer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Credit Consultative, Inc. doing business as Franchisee (#18734) of H&R Block, Inc.
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Represented By: Matthew M. Mize
Represented By: John Edward Carr, III
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?