Heilbut et al v. Cassava Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: ENEA MILIORIS, ADRIAN HEILBUT and JESSE BRODKIN
Defendant: CASSAVA SCIENCES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2024cv05948
Filed: August 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 8/28/2024) (tg)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (tro)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:22-cv-09409-GHW-OTW and declined by Judge Gregory H. Woods and returned to wheel for assignment. (tro)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Wong on behalf of Adrian Heilbut, Enea Milioris, Jesse Brodkin..(Wong, Amanda)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Robert Shine Kumagai on behalf of Adrian Heilbut, Enea Milioris, Jesse Brodkin..(Kumagai, David)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adrian Heilbut, Enea Milioris, Jesse Brodkin..(Zaur, Isaac)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zaur, Isaac)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Isaac Berkman Zaur to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships of principal parties were selected for the plaintiff. Chose one for the first listed plaintiff;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Isaac Berkman Zaur. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case - Other; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $25,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Isaac Berkman Zaur. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ADRIAN HEILBUT, ENEA MILIORIS, JESSE BRODKIN, CASSAVA SCIENCES, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; DO NOT ENTER ALL PARTIES IN ALL CAPS. (pc)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 22cv9409. (pc)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-09409. Document filed by JESSE BRODKIN, ADRIAN HEILBUT, ENEA MILIORIS..(Zaur, Isaac)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zaur, Isaac) Modified on 8/7/2024 (pc).
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CASSAVA SCIENCES, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29708741)Document filed by ADRIAN HEILBUT, ENEA MILIORIS, JESSE BRODKIN..(Zaur, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heilbut et al v. Cassava Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASSAVA SCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENEA MILIORIS
Represented By: Isaac Berkman Zaur
Represented By: David Robert Shine Kumagai
Represented By: Amanda Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN HEILBUT
Represented By: Isaac Berkman Zaur
Represented By: David Robert Shine Kumagai
Represented By: Amanda Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE BRODKIN
Represented By: Isaac Berkman Zaur
Represented By: David Robert Shine Kumagai
Represented By: Amanda Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?