Jones et al v. Universal Music Group et al
Plaintiff: Lavelle Webb, Robert Kyjuan Cleveland, Torhi Harper and Ali Jones
Defendant: Universal Music Group, BMG Songs Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc. doing business as Kobalt Music Group, Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Universal Music Corp. and Cornell Ira Haynes, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2024cv07098
Filed: September 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Walton, Gail)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 MOTION for Precious Felder Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Precious Felder Gates, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/23/2024) (jca)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Precious Felder Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Precious Felder Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Kyjuan Cleveland, Torhi Harper, Ali Jones, Lavelle Webb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Mot for Pro Hac).(Walton, Gail)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against BMG Songs Inc., Cornell Ira Haynes, Jr., Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc., Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group. Document filed by Robert Kyjuan Cleveland, Torhi Harper, Ali Jones, Lavelle Webb..(Walton, Gail)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents BMG Songs Inc., Cornell Ira Haynes, Jr., Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC, Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc., Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group, Universal Music Corp. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Universal Music Corp.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Walton, Gail)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Gail Melanie Walton to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gail Melanie Walton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Torhi Harper; Robert Kyjuan Cleveland; Kobalt Music Publishing; Hipgnosis Songs Group; Cornell (Nelly) Haynes; Ali Jones. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gail Melanie Walton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $50,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gail Melanie Walton to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Universal Music Corp.; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 FIRST MOTION for Precious Felder Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29914798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order; Motion must have a wet signature from the attorney seeking pro hac status if filing using another individual's Pacer account; no case number or Judge listed on the documentation;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (rju)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Walton, Gail)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Precious Felder Gates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29914798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Kyjuan Cleveland, Torhi Harper, Ali Jones, Lavelle Webb. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion).(Walton, Gail) Modified on 9/19/2024 (rju).
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against BMG Songs Inc., Cornell (Nelly) Haynes, Hipgnosis Songs Group, Kobalt Music Publishing, Universal Music Group, Universal Music Publishing Group. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29914772)Document filed by Ali Jones..(Walton, Gail) Modified on 9/19/2024 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Universal Music Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavelle Webb
Represented By: Gail Melanie Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kyjuan Cleveland
Represented By: Gail Melanie Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torhi Harper
Represented By: Gail Melanie Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Jones
Represented By: Gail Melanie Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Songs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobalt Music Publishing America Inc. doing business as Kobalt Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipgnosis Songs Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Ira Haynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?