Lugo v. Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jillian Lugo
Defendant: Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv07223
Filed: September 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Friday, December 6, 2024 at 2:00 pm. in Courtroom 9B at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. The parties are instructed to complete the Ex Parte Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with my Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received no later than December 2, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. Corporate parties must send the person with decision-making authority to settle the matter to the conference. If attending in person presents a hardship for any party, they may submit a letter on the docket explaining the situation and the reasons why they believe the settlement conference should be held remotely. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky) (Text Only Order) (ah)
November 18, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc...(Zoldessy, Jason)
November 18, 2024 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc...(Zoldessy, Jason)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc. answer due 11/18/2024.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/10/24) (yv)
October 9, 2024 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jason A. Zoldessy dated October 9, 2024. Document filed by Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc...(Zoldessy, Jason)
October 9, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A Zoldessy on behalf of Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc...(Zoldessy, Jason)
September 30, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc. served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Jillian Lugo(on behalf of herself, individually); Jillian Lugo(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Tarnofsky no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for December 17, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/26/24) (yv)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Separate and apart from the foregoing, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 17, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the initial pretrial conference regarding each of the subjects to be considered at a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 conference (as well as the subject discussed in Paragraph (5) below). Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/26/24) (yv)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc...(pc)
September 25, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 25, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 25, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 24, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barnhorn, David)
September 24, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jillian Lugo(on behalf of herself, individually), Jillian Lugo(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated)..(Barnhorn, David)
September 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29940819)Document filed by Jillian Lugo(on behalf of herself, individually), Jillian Lugo(on behalf of all other persons similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue).(Barnhorn, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Lugo
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowery Residents' Committee, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A Zoldessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?