Berger v. The Department of Defense
Plaintiff: Jonathan S. Berger
Defendant: The Department of Defense
Case Number: 1:2024cv07450
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Filing 19 APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO APPOINT PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (vfr)
October 30, 2024 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated 10/30/2024 re: Letter from Jonathan Berger.(jw)
October 28, 2024 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jonathan Berger re: #15 Notice (Other). Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 28, 2024 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jonathan Berger in Support re: #13 MOTION MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AS A RESULT OF REFUSAL OF PROCESS SERVICE BY THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 28, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION re: #13 MOTION MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AS A RESULT OF REFUSAL OF PROCESS SERVICE BY THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION re: #13 MOTION MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AS A RESULT OF REFUSAL OF PROCESS SERVICE BY THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 28, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AS A RESULT OF REFUSAL OF PROCESS SERVICE BY THE DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 22, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Closed Court. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (ar)
October 17, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sac)
October 10, 2024 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $405.00 Credit Card processed by the Finance Department on 10/10/2024, Receipt Number 33614. (ss)
October 9, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 8. Mailed to: Jonathan S. Berger 541 3rd Ave Unit 145 New York, NY 10016.
October 4, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jonathan Berger in Support re: #9 MOTION to Expedite.. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger..(jjc)
October 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION to Expedite. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jjc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is denied because Plaintiff has sufficient assets to pay the fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Plaintiff is directed to pay $405.00 in fees a $350.00 filing fee and a $55.00 administrative fee within 30 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed. Filing Fee due by 11/4/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/4/2024) (vn)
October 4, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (nb)
October 3, 2024 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Jonathan S. Berger 541 3rd Ave Unit 145 New York, NY 10016. (vba)
October 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION for Translations to Standard English. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jbo)
October 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION for Good-Faith Healthcare. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jbo)
October 2, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION for Unobstructed Legal Services. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jbo)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may #consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for #permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/24) (jbo)
October 2, 2024 CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see #Rule 9.2 of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (jbo)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jbo)
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jbo)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Department of Defense. Document filed by Jonathan S. Berger. (jbo)
September 27, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jbo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. The Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan S. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?