The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees v. Cooley et al
Plaintiff: The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees
Defendant: Rodney David Oliver, Joe Cooley and d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing
Case Number: 1:2024cv07509
Filed: October 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Granted in part. Response is due December 4. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/31/2024) (vfr)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Timothy Matson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joe Cooley answer due 12/4/2024; Rodney David Oliver answer due 12/4/2024; d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing answer due 12/4/2024. (vfr)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Timothy Matson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philip Langer, Esq. dated 10/30/2024. Document filed by Joe Cooley, Rodney David Oliver, d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing..(Langer, Philip)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Timothy Matson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joe Cooley, Rodney David Oliver, d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy Matson In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Matson, Timothy) Modified on 10/30/2024 (rju). Modified on 10/31/2024 (rju).
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Langer on behalf of Joe Cooley, Rodney David Oliver, d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing..(Langer, Philip)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #19 MOTION for Timothy Matson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30117818..(Matson, Timothy)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER This action was filed on October 3, 2024. The Complaint and its attached exhibits reference three songs that are at issue in this action. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall submit a CD or flash drive containing the songs referenced in the Complaint and Exhibits to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file with the Clerk of Court a copy of this Order as well as a copy of the same CD or flash drive by delivery to Records Management in Room 370 at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2024) (ar)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Dorothy M. Weber dated October 29, 2024 re: Leave of the Court. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. Service was accepted by Necole Key II, Manager. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joe Cooley served on 10/11/2024, answer due 11/1/2024. Service was accepted by Lillie Cooley, Mother. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/8/2024) (vfr)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing..(pc)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rodney David Oliver..(jgo)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rodney David Oliver p/k/a Rodney-O, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joe Cooley..(pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dorothy M Weber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000;. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dorothy M Weber to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name does not exactly match complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #9 incorrectly issued summons. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dorothy M Weber to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name does not exactly match complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dorothy M Weber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Not Intrested Publishing. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Not Intrested Publishing, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy) Modified on 10/4/2024 (pc).
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rodney David Oliver p/k/a Rodney-O, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy) Modified on 10/4/2024 (pc).
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joe Cooley, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weber, Dorothy)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Cooley, Not Intrested Publishing, Rodney David Oliver. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29988263)Document filed by The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyrighted Work, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Work, #4 Exhibit D - Everlasting Bass).(Weber, Dorothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees v. Cooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney David Oliver
Represented By: Timothy Matson
Represented By: Philip Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Cooley
Represented By: Timothy Matson
Represented By: Philip Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: d/b/a Not Intrested Publishing
Represented By: Timothy Matson
Represented By: Philip Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Barry White Family Trust U/A/D: December 19, 1980, By its Duly Empowered Trustees
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?