Doe v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Organizational Does 1-10, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Sean Combs, Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Individual Does 1-10, CE OPCO, LLC doing business as Combs Global f/k/a Combs Enterprises LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Daddy's House Recordings Inc. and Bad Boy Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv07974
Filed: October 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc...(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc...(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CE OPCO, LLC..(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc...(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Records LLC..(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daddy's House Recordings Inc...(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Combs..(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Entertainment LLC..(gp)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Boy Productions LLC..(gp)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER temporarily granting #14 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, Notice of Motion. On October 24, 2024, Plaintiff filed a motion seeking to proceed under the pseudonym "John Doe." See ECF No. 14. The motion is GRANTED temporarily. Defendants - and any non-party who seeks, and is granted, leave to intervene for purposes of being heard on the issue- shall file any opposition to the motion within three weeks of the first Defendant's entry of a notice of appearance; any reply shall be filed within one week of any opposition. In the meantime, the Court reserves judgment on whether to grant the motion on a more permanent basis. Plaintiff shall serve this Order on all Defendants with the summons and Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons and terminate ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/29/2024) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT held in Judge Furman's Chambers..(ab)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #17 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by John Doe. Related Document Number: [14-16]..(Curis, Antigone) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, Notice of Motion. . Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Anthony G. Buzbee in Support re: #14 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, Notice of Motion.. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, Notice of Motion. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/22/2024) (jca)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Rule 10(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that all the parties be named in the title of the complaint. Plaintiff did not seek leave to file his complaint using pseudonyms. Plaintiff shall file a motion seeking leave to proceed under pseudonym no later than October 25, 2024. Failure to comply with the Courts instruction will result in dismissal of the complaint without prejudice to refiling and without further notice to the parties. Moreover, to ensure that the Court has no conflicts that would require recusal, Plaintiff shall promptly file, under seal, a declaration disclosing his identity (and the identity of any other party that is not named in the Complaint) to the Court. To ensure that his name does not appear on the public docket, Plaintiffs counsel should ensure that the declaration is titled Declaration of John Doe. No summons shall issue until the Court resolves whether Plaintiff may proceed pseudonymously. ( Motions due by 10/25/2024.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/21/2024) (jjc)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Productions LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Records LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CE Opco, LLC dba Combs Global fka Combs Enterprises LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daddy's House Recordings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Combs, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curis, Antigone)
October 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, CE OPCO, LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., Individual Does 1-10, Organizational Does 1-10. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30066551)Document filed by John Doe..(Curis, Antigone)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Records LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organizational Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Productions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CE OPCO, LLC doing business as Combs Global f/k/a Combs Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daddy's House Recordings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Antigone Curis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?