Butt v. MDS Construction Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Butt
Defendant: Gohar Construction Corp., Mor Diao, MDS Construction Management, LLC and Azhar Bhatti
Cross-Defendant: Gohar Construction Corp.
Cross-Complainant: Mor Diao and MDS Construction Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv08125
Filed: October 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gohar Construction Corp., Azhar Bhatti..(Hart, Ronald)
December 12, 2024 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gohar Construction Corp...(Hart, Ronald) Modified on 12/13/2024 (lb).
December 12, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Paul Hart on behalf of Azhar Bhatti..(Hart, Ronald)
December 12, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Paul Hart on behalf of Gohar Construction Corp...(Hart, Ronald)
December 12, 2024 Filing 15 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gohar Construction Corp...(Hart, Ronald)
December 12, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Gohar Construction Corp.. Document filed by Mor Diao, MDS Construction Management, LLC..(Carrascal, Daniel)
December 12, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MDS Construction Management, LLC, Mor Diao..(Carrascal, Daniel)
December 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Frank Carrascal on behalf of MDS Construction Management, LLC, Mor Diao..(Carrascal, Daniel)
December 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Charles Waters on behalf of MDS Construction Management, LLC, Mor Diao..(Waters, Gerald)
December 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manny A. Frade on behalf of MDS Construction Management, LLC, Mor Diao..(Frade, Manny)
December 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ana Getiashvili on behalf of MDS Construction Management, LLC, Mor Diao..(Getiashvili, Ana)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Muhammad Butt. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. This, however, doesn't change the date for the submission of the parties' required materials or the initial pretrial conference, absent further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/31/2024) (jjc)
October 31, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Muhammad Butt..(Lee, C.K.)
October 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 803 568 319, followed by the pound (#) sign. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/28/2024) (kgo)
October 28, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Azhar Bhatti, Mor Diao, Gohar Construction Corp., MDS Construction Management, LLC. (sj)
October 28, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 28, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
October 28, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
October 25, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Muhammad Butt..(Lee, C.K.)
October 25, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Azhar Bhatti, Mor Diao, Gohar Construction Corp., MDS Construction Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Muhammad Butt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider).(Lee, C.K.)
October 25, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
October 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Azhar Bhatti, Mor Diao, Gohar Construction Corp., MDS Construction Management, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30097182)Document filed by Muhammad Butt..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butt v. MDS Construction Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gohar Construction Corp.
Represented By: Ronald Paul Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mor Diao
Represented By: Manny A. Frade
Represented By: Gerald Charles Waters
Represented By: Daniel Frank Carrascal
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDS Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Manny A. Frade
Represented By: Gerald Charles Waters
Represented By: Daniel Frank Carrascal
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azhar Bhatti
Represented By: Ronald Paul Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Gohar Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Mor Diao
Represented By: Manny A. Frade
Represented By: Gerald Charles Waters
Represented By: Daniel Frank Carrascal
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: MDS Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Manny A. Frade
Represented By: Gerald Charles Waters
Represented By: Daniel Frank Carrascal
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Butt
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?