ONEflight International, Inc v. Stallion Aviation, LLC
Plaintiff: ONEflight International, Inc
Defendant: Stallion Aviation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv08381
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order #9 served on STALLION AVIATION, LLC on 12/17/2024. Service was accepted by Delaware Secretary of State, Agent. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Order #9 , #2 Errata B - Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Errata C - Service of Order #9 ).(Bronshteyn, Leo)
December 14, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Disclosure, Individual Rules of Practice - Hon. John G. Koeltl. served on STALLION AVIATION, LLC on 12/11/24. Service was accepted by Delaware Secretary of State. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc..(Bronshteyn, Leo)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Pursuant to Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the time for the defendant to answer was December 10, 2024. To date, no answers have been filed. The time for the defendant to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to January 13, 2025. Failure to respond to the complaint by this date could result in a default judgment being entered against the defendant. The plaintiff should serve a copy of this Order on the defendant and file proof of service on the docket by December 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. Stallion Aviation, LLC answer due 1/13/2025. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/13/2024) (jca)
November 20, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stallion Aviation, LLC served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. Service was accepted by Nadia Bellamy. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc..(Samuels, Jason)
November 19, 2024 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stallion Aviation, LLC served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. Service was accepted by Nadia Bellamy. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc..(Samuels, Jason) Modified on 11/20/2024 (kj). As Per Email Dated 11/20/2024, 10:03 AM
November 18, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 6, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stallion Aviation, LLC. (sj)
November 6, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 6, 2024 Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 6, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 6, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason S. Samuels. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 6, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason S. Samuels. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ONEflight International, Inc., Stallion Aviation, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
November 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Bronshteyn on behalf of ONEflight International, Inc..(Bronshteyn, Leo)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stallion Aviation, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc..(Samuels, Jason)
November 4, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc..(Samuels, Jason)
November 4, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Samuels, Jason)
November 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stallion Aviation, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30136024)Document filed by ONEflight International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Lease, #2 Exhibit 2: Demand for Possession, #3 Exhibit 3: Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit 4: Order of Possession).(Samuels, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONEflight International, Inc v. Stallion Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONEflight International, Inc
Represented By: Jason S. Samuels
Represented By: Leo Bronshteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stallion Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?