Burnett v. City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Burnett
Defendant: Lisa Stephenson, Michael Weinberg, Michael Shum, City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection and Cecil McMaster
Case Number: 1:2024cv08725
Filed: November 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection..(pc)
December 30, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Weinberg(in their individual capacity), Michael Weinberg(in his official capacity), Michael Weinberg(as aider and abettor)..(pc)
December 30, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cecil McMaster(in his official capacity), Cecil McMaster(as aider and abettor), Cecil McMaster(in their individual capacity)..(pc)
December 30, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Shum(as aider and abettor), Michael Shum(in their individual capacity), Michael Shum(in his official capacity)..(pc)
December 30, 2024 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lisa Stephenson(as aider and abettor), Lisa Stephenson(in her official capacity), Lisa Stephenson(in their individual capacity)..(pc)
December 23, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Weinberg, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Michael Weinberg(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special)
December 23, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Stephenson, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Lisa Stephenson(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special)
December 23, 2024 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Shum, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Michael Shum(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special)
December 23, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cecil McMaster, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cecil McMaster(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special)
December 23, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection..(Hagan, Special)
December 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Special Hagan to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF for the request for issuance of summons is not legible; party name listed on the ECF docket text, the PDF case caption and the PDF 'To' field must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 19, 2024 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Weinberg, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Michael Weinberg(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 12/20/2024 (jgo).
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Stephenson, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Lisa Stephenson(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 12/20/2024 (jgo).
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Shum, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Michael Shum(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 12/20/2024 (jgo).
December 19, 2024 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cecil McMaster, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Cecil McMaster(in their individual capacity)..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 12/20/2024 (jgo).
December 19, 2024 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #6 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 12/20/2024 (jgo).
November 26, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection, Cecil McMaster(in his official capacity), Cecil McMaster(as aider and abettor), Cecil McMaster(in their individual capacity), Michael Shum(as aider and abettor), Michael Shum(in their individual capacity), Michael Shum(in his official capacity), Lisa Stephenson(as aider and abettor), Lisa Stephenson(in her official capacity), Lisa Stephenson(in their individual capacity), Michael Weinberg(in their individual capacity), Michael Weinberg(in his official capacity), Michael Weinberg(as aider and abettor). Document filed by Tracy Burnett..(Hagan, Special)
November 26, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Special Hagan to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 25, 2024 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection, Cecil McMaster(as aider and abettor), Cecil McMaster(in their individual capacity), Michael Shum(in their individual capacity), Michael Shum(in his official capacity), Lisa Stephenson(in her official capacity), Lisa Stephenson(in their individual capacity), Michael Weinberg(in his official capacity), Michael Weinberg(as aider and abettor). Document filed by Tracy Burnett..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 11/26/2024 (jgo).
November 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Special Hagan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected (not all the defendants were selected). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Special Hagan dated November 20, 2024 re: application to submit Verified Complaint as the operative initiating pleading. Document filed by Tracy Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 3 Verified Complaint dated November 20, 2024).(Hagan, Special)
November 20, 2024 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Cecil McMaster, Cecil McMaster, Lisa Stephenson, Lisa Stephenson, Michael Shum, Michael Shum, Michael Weinberg, Michael Weinberg. Document filed by Tracy Burnett..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 11/21/2024 (gp).
November 18, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 18, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 18, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Special Hagan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK; Cecil McMaster; Michael C. Shum; Lisa Stephenson; Michael Weinberg. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
November 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Special Hagan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:201; Nature of Suit code 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); Dollar Demand $3,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 440 (Civil Rights: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,000,000;. (jgo)
November 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Special Hagan to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Defendants with party text 'in their official capacity' and separately with party text 'as aiders and abettors'; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 17, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hagan, Special)
November 17, 2024 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Cecil McMaster, Michael C. Shum, Lisa Stephenson, Michael Weinberg. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30195583)Document filed by Tracy Burnett..(Hagan, Special) Modified on 11/18/2024 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett v. City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York/New York City Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Burnett
Represented By: Special Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?