Moon v. World Trade Art Gallery Inc
Plaintiff: Jeenah Moon
Defendant: World Trade Art Gallery Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv08785
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 15 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to World Trade Art Gallery Inc.(nd)
January 13, 2025 Filing 14 AFFIRMATION of Craig Sanders in Support re: #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Jeenah Moon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Sanders, Craig)
January 13, 2025 Filing 13 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jeenah Moon..(Sanders, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/13/2025 (nd).
January 10, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Craig Sanders to RE-FILE Document #12 Affidavit in Support. Use the event type Other Answers, Affirmation in support (non-motion). (km)
January 10, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Craig Sanders. RE-FILE Document No. #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Supporting document not filed correctly. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (km)
January 9, 2025 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT of Craig Sanders in Support re: #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Jeenah Moon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Sanders, Craig) Modified on 1/10/2025 (km).
January 9, 2025 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jeenah Moon..(Sanders, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/10/2025 (km).
January 6, 2025 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of Craig Sanders in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Jeenah Moon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Sanders, Craig) Modified on 1/6/2025 (tp).
January 6, 2025 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jeenah Moon..(Sanders, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/6/2025 (tp).
January 6, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Craig B. Sanders. RE-FILE Document No. #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong filed date for the complaint. Use the 11/19/2024 for when the action commenced and Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (tp)
January 6, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Craig B. Sanders to RE-FILE Document #10 Affirmation in Support. ERROR(S): the document is associated with a deficient docket entry. (tp)
December 6, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. World Trade Art Gallery Inc served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Clerk. Document filed by Jeenah Moon..(Sanders, Craig)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-855-244-8681 Access Code: 2305 810 3970 #. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/26/2024) (tg)
November 20, 2024 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
November 20, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to World Trade Art Gallery Inc..(pc)
November 20, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 20, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 20, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to World Trade Art Gallery Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeenah Moon..(Sanders, Craig)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against World Trade Art Gallery Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30203676)Document filed by Jeenah Moon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing use of Photograph).(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. World Trade Art Gallery Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Trade Art Gallery Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeenah Moon
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?