David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA 02/13/19 v. Pressure BioSciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA
Defendant: Pressure BioSciences, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv08792
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the conference held on January 8, 2025, Plaintiff is directed to file and serve a complaint in this matter. The deadline for Plaintiff to file and serve a complaint is January 24, 2025. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference is adjourned to March 11, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's November 22, 2024 order are due no later than March 4, 2025. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.), ( Service due by 1/24/2025.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/8/2025) (sgz)
January 2, 2025 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA 02/13/19..(DeVita, Richard)
January 2, 2025 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Richard DeVita dated 1/2/2025 re: Case Management. Document filed by David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA 02/13/19..(DeVita, Richard)
December 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Daniel DeVita on behalf of David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA 02/13/19..(DeVita, Richard)
November 26, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order (Dkt. 06) served on Plaintiff on 11/26/2024. Document filed by Pressure BioSciences, Inc...(Blatnick, Samuel)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, on November 20, 2024. Dkt. No. 4. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than December 4, 2024. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/25/2024) (sgz)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. January 8, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Courts website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/22/2024) (sgz)
November 21, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 21, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 21, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 21, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samuel Blatnick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand (none); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
November 21, 2024 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 405.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-30205275, paid on 11/19/2024. (sj)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York..Document filed by Pressure BioSciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Summons with Notice), #2 Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of Service), #3 Exhibit 3 (Promissory Notes), #4 Exhibit 4 (Summons from Miller Trust)).(Blatnick, Samuel)
November 20, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Samuel Blatnick to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/25/2024. (pc)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Richard Schumacher (in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal). Document filed by Pressure BioSciences, Inc...(Blatnick, Samuel)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pressure BioSciences, Inc...(Blatnick, Samuel)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blatnick, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA 02/13/19 v. Pressure BioSciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Miller, Trustee of the Miller Protective Trust UA
Represented By: Richard Daniel DeVita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pressure BioSciences, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Blatnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?