NY Daily Newswire, LLC v. Screenprism Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: NY Daily Newswire, LLC
Defendant: Screenprism Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv09337
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Screenprism Media, Inc.(km)
January 30, 2025 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Plaintiffs Request for Clerks Certificate of Default and all its supporting documents [ECF No. 11] served on Screenprism Media, Inc. on January 30, 2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
January 30, 2025 Filing 12 AFFIRMATION of Craig Sanders in Support re: #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Sanders, Craig)
January 30, 2025 Filing 11 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC..(Sanders, Craig) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/30/2025 (km).
January 2, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Screenprism Media, Inc. served on 12/31/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Clerk. Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on March 12, 2025 at 2:00 PM. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 788 958 356, followed by the pound (#) sign. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as Lead Trial Counsel. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 12/13/2024) (jjc)
December 12, 2024 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
December 12, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Screenprism Media, Inc...(jgo)
December 10, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 10, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 10, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Craig B. Sanders to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
December 9, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Screenprism Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC..(Sanders, Craig)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) Modified on 12/10/2024 (jgo).
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Screenprism Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30297655)Document filed by NY Daily Newswire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing uses of Photograph).(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NY Daily Newswire, LLC v. Screenprism Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screenprism Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NY Daily Newswire, LLC
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?