Gonzalez v. J&G Italian Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Eduardo Gonzalez
Defendant: J&G Italian Restaurant Corp. d/b/a San Gennaro Restaurant and Gennaro Martinelli
Case Number: 1:2024cv09405
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Settlement Conference held on 2/4/2025 at 9:30 a.m. (rsh)
January 23, 2025 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 1/23/2025 at 11:00 a.m. (rsh)
January 7, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 11:00 AM in advance of a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices and Settlement Conference. (rsh)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request is granted; the Court will reschedule the conference. The Court extends its sympathies to counsel and his family. Counsel is reminded that any future application for an adjournment should contain the information required by Judge Lehrburger's rules, should propose a new date or time frame for a rescheduled conference, and should indicate whether opposing counsel has consented. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/7/2025) (mml)
January 6, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Kevin B. Faga dated 1/6/25. Document filed by J&G Italian Restaurant Corp., Gennaro Martinelli..(Faga, Kevin)
January 6, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew David Beresin on behalf of Eduardo Gonzalez..(Beresin, Andrew)
January 3, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. This conference will be conducted via Microsoft Teams. A link will be emailed to the parties, one week prior to the conference. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's individual Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties are further instructed to submit their pre-conference submissions, along with their Attendance Acknowledgment Form (available in pdf fillable format as attachment to the Settlement Conference Procedures) no later than January 28, 2025, by 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (rsh).
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 2:30 PM in advance of a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are instructed to review and adhere to Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices and Settlement Conference Procedures. The parties shall call the teleconference line at (646)-453-4442, and enter access code 217212458#. (rsh)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by J&G Italian Restaurant Corp., Gennaro Martinelli..(Faga, Kevin)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J&G Italian Restaurant Corp...(Faga, Kevin)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Lehrburger no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/24) (yv)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Separate and apart from the foregoing, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on March 26, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the initial pretrial conference regarding each of the subjects to be considered at a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 conference (as well as the subject discussed in Paragraph (5) below). Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 3.D of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/26/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/24) (yv)
December 11, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J&G Italian Restaurant Corp., Gennaro Martinelli..(gp)
December 11, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 11, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 11, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to defendants J&G Italian Restaurant Corp. and Gennaro Martinelli, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eduardo Gonzalez..(Samuel, Michael)
December 10, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Samuel, Michael)
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J&G Italian Restaurant Corp., Gennaro Martinelli. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30309320)Document filed by Eduardo Gonzalez..(Samuel, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. J&G Italian Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&G Italian Restaurant Corp. d/b/a San Gennaro Restaurant
Represented By: Kevin Brian Faga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gennaro Martinelli
Represented By: Kevin Brian Faga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael Steven Samuel
Represented By: Andrew David Beresin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?