Ruzwin v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Bristol Ruzwin
Defendant: Ted H. Kim, Kathleen Joyce Donaire, Chani Morganstern, Susan Raufer, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Newark Asylum Office (USCIS)
Case Number: 1:2024cv09566
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 706 (a) Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial conference with the Court at the time listed below. March 27, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. The conference will be held by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/17/2024) (sgz)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/17/2024) (sgz)
December 16, 2024 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 16, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ted H. Kim, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Raufer, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newark Asylum Office (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathleen Joyce Donaire, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chani Morganstern, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(gp)
December 16, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Amy Leipziger to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'As to' does not match the entire name of the party on the pleading/docket. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
December 16, 2024 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 16, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 16, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amy L Leipziger. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: USCIS - party name contained a typographical error and All Defendants - party text omitted. (gp)
December 13, 2024 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USCIS, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy) Modified on 12/16/2024 (gp).
December 13, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Raufer, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Newark Asylum Office, USCIS, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chani Morganstern, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ted H. Kim, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur M. Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathleen Joyce Donaire, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SNAP and HRA Budget, #2 Exhibit EBT Card).(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy L Leipziger on behalf of Bristol Ruzwin..(Leipziger, Amy)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kathleen Joyce Donaire, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Chani Morganstern, Newark Asylum Office, Susan Raufer, USCIS.Document filed by Bristol Ruzwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit B - I-589, #3 Exhibit C - Failure to Prosecute, #4 Exhibit D - Expedite Request, #5 Exhibit E - Expedite Approval, #6 Exhibit F - Interview Notice, #7 Exhibit G - Evidence Package, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Clement Lee, Esq.).(Leipziger, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruzwin v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Ruzwin
Represented By: Amy L Leipziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Joyce Donaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chani Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Raufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newark Asylum Office (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?