I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL v. Gignet, Inc. et al
Petitioner: I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL
Respondent: Gignet, Inc. and FB Submarine Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv09590
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby: ORDERED that Petitioner shall file and serve any additional materials with which it intends to support its petition for confirmation by January 28, 2025. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on February 18, 2025. Petitioner's reply, if any, is due on February 25, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/15/2025) ( Responses due by 2/18/2025, Replies due by 2/25/2025.) (ks)
December 26, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award with Associated Documents served on FB Submarine Partners LLC on December 16, 2024. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 26, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award with Associated Documents served on GigNet Inc. on December 16, 2024. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 17, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FB Submarine Partners LLC, Gignet, Inc...(pc)
December 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yaakov U. Adler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,700,815,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GigNet, Inc., and FB Submarine Partners LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Yaakov U. Adler in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Contract, #2 Exhibit B - The Award).(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of of Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Adler, Yaakov)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30336153).Document filed by I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL..(Adler, Yaakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL v. Gignet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gignet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FB Submarine Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: I.T. International Telecom Marine SRL
Represented By: Yaakov U. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?