Ravazzani v. Shop PO, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Pablo Ravazzani
Defendant: The Carriage House LLC, Deborah Kent's, Inc., Paul Simon Company, Mosley & Company LLC, Osmon, Urrutia LLC, John Doe doing business as Linz Shop, The Sophia Lustig Shop, Inc., O'Connell's Clothing, C K Collection, Inc., Kathryn's Collection Inc., HDHA, LLC doing business as The Wardrobe Consultant, Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc. and Shop PO, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv09673
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 37 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kevin McCulloch dated 2/13/2025. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
January 18, 2025 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HDHA, LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
January 17, 2025 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kathryn's Collection Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
January 16, 2025 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025; Shop PO, LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
January 16, 2025 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Deborah Kent's, Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/19/2024) (vfr)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by February 18, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/19/2024) (vfr)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by February 18, 2025, file a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, as further set forth herein. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by February 18, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/19/2024) (vfr)
December 18, 2024 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C K Collection, Inc.. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mosley & Company LLC. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deborah Kent's, Inc.. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Sophia Lustig Shop, Inc.. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Simon Company. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Carriage House LLC. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to O'Connell's Clothing. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shop PO, LLC. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathryn's Collection Inc.. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Osmon, Urrutia LLC. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HDHA, LLC. (sj)
December 18, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc.. (sj)
December 17, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Kleinman on behalf of Pablo Ravazzani..(Kleinman, Nathaniel)
December 17, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C K Collection, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mosley & Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deborah Kent's, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Sophia Lustig Shop, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Simon Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Carriage House LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O'Connell's Clothing, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shop PO, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathryn's Collection Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Osmon, Urrutia LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HDHA, LLC d/b/a The Wardrobe Consultant, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 17, 2024 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
December 17, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 17, 2024 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 17, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCulloch, Kevin)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C K Collection, Inc., Deborah Kent's, Inc., HDHA, LLC, John Doe, Kathryn's Collection Inc., Mosley & Company LLC, O'Connell's Clothing, Osmon, Urrutia LLC, Paul Simon Company, Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc., SHOP PO, LLC., The Carriage House LLC, The Sophia Lustig Shop, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30339382)Document filed by Pablo Ravazzani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Shop PO Screen Captures, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kathryns Screen Captures, #3 Exhibit 3 - O Connells Screen Captures, #4 Exhibit 4 - Carriage House Screen Captures, #5 Exhibit 5 - Paul Simon Screen Captures, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sophia Lustig Screen Captures, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deborah Kent Screen Captures, #8 Exhibit 8 - Carl Meyers Screen Captures, #9 Exhibit 9 - CK Collection Screen Captures, #10 Exhibit 10 - Sabot Boutique Screen Captures, #11 Exhibit 11 - Wardrobe Consultant Screen Captures).(McCulloch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravazzani v. Shop PO, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Carriage House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Kent's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Simon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosley & Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osmon, Urrutia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe doing business as Linz Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sophia Lustig Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Connell's Clothing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C K Collection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn's Collection Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDHA, LLC doing business as The Wardrobe Consultant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rue Gilt Groupe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop PO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Ravazzani
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?