Alexandru v. Applied Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Alexandru
Defendant: Shoshana Shendelman, Applied Therapeutics, Inc. and Riccardo Perfetti
Case Number: 1:2024cv09715
Filed: December 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties that: 1. Defendants' time to respond is extended until after a Lead Plaintiff has been appointed and an operative complaint has been filed or so designated; 2. Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; 3. Within fourteen (14) days following entry of an order pursuant to the PSLRA selecting a Lead Plaintiff and appointing Lead Counsel, Defendants and Lead Plaintiff shall confer and submit a proposed schedule; and 4. Except as specifically set forth herein, all rights, claims and defenses of the parties are fully preserved. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/13/2025) (vfr)
January 10, 2025 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Bongiorno, Michael)
January 10, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ripley Shiarella on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Shiarella, Ripley)
January 10, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Kaplan-Marans, Tamar)
January 10, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(Bongiorno, Michael)
January 2, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Riccardo Perfetti served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. Service was accepted by Pamela Larosa, Registered Agent. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 31, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Shoshana Shendelman served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. Service was accepted by Pamela Larosa, Registered Agent. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 31, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Applied Therapeutics, Inc. served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. Service was accepted by Pamela Larosa, Registered Agent. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel appears to have published the required notice on December 20, 2024. Members of the purported class therefore have until February 18, 2025 to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiffs. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference shall be held at 2:00 p.m. on March 7, 2025 in Courtroom 18B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that opposition to any motion for appointment of lead plaintiff shall be served and filed by February 28, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the named plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the defendants. ( Motions due by 2/18/2025., Responses due by 2/28/2025, Status Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/20/2024) (vfr)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shoshana Shendelman..(jgo)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Riccardo Perfetti..(jgo)
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Applied Therapeutics, Inc...(jgo)
December 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Riccardo Perfetti. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 18, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam M. Apton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
December 18, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 18, 2024 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 18, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Soshana Shendelman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 17, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Riccardo Perfetti, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Therapeutics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adrian Alexandru..(Apton, Adam)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Apton, Adam)
December 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Applied Therapeutics, Inc., Riccardo Perfetti, Shoshana Shendelman. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30345716)Document filed by Adrian Alexandru. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification).(Apton, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandru v. Applied Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoshana Shendelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Ripley Shiarella
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riccardo Perfetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Alexandru
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?