Doe v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., CE Opco, LLC doing business as Combs Global f/k/a Combs Enterprises LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Organizational Does 1-10 and Individual Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2024cv09852
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Rochon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Tremonte on behalf of Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., CE Opco, LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc...(Tremonte, Michael)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Ashley Wolff on behalf of Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., CE Opco, LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc...(Wolff, Erica)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Elliot Cuccaro on behalf of Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., CE Opco, LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc...(Cuccaro, Mark)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The requested extensions are GRANTED. Defendants shall either answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 4, 2025; and shall have until March 4, 2025 to file an opposition to the Second Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously. SO ORDERED. Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc. answer due 3/4/2025; Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc. answer due 3/4/2025; Bad Boy Entertainment LLC answer due 3/4/2025; Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc. answer due 3/4/2025; Bad Boy Productions LLC answer due 3/4/2025; Bad Boy Records LLC answer due 3/4/2025; CE Opco, LLC answer due 3/4/2025; Sean Combs answer due 3/4/2025; Daddy's House Recordings Inc. answer due 3/4/2025. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/14/2025) (jca)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, #15 SECOND MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously . addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Counsel for All Parties dated 1/14/2025. Document filed by Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., CE Opco, LLC, Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc...(Cuccaro, Mark)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/4/2025 (jca)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe. Related Document Number: [15-17]..(Curis, Antigone) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 SECOND MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Anthony G. Buzbee in Support re: #15 SECOND MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously .. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference on March 19, 2025, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 01/13/2025) Initial Conference set for 3/19/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (ar)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #18 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate AI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Bad Boy Records, Other Affiliate Warner Music Group Corp., Other Affiliate BB Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlantic Recording Corporation for Bad Boy Records LLC. Document filed by Bad Boy Records LLC..(Saady, Nicholas)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas George Saady on behalf of Bad Boy Records LLC..(Saady, Nicholas)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Laurence Charron on behalf of Bad Boy Records LLC..(Charron, William)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald S. Zakarin on behalf of Bad Boy Records LLC..(Zakarin, Donald)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER terminating #4 Motion; terminating #8 Motion It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a renewed motion to proceed anonymously no later than thirty (30) days after service of the Complaint, in order to provide Defendants with an opportunity to respond to the motion. If Plaintiff fails to timely file this motion, the Court shall order the disclosure of her identity. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending motions at Dkts. 4 and 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 12/23/2024) (jca)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #7 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Antigone Curis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1391; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Antigone Curis to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe. Related Document Number: [4-6]..(Curis, Antigone) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Anthony G Buzbee in Support re: #4 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, .. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
December 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Anonymously re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEAN COMBS, DADDYS HOUSE RECORDINGS INC., CE OPCO, LLC d/b/a COMBS GLOBAL f/k/a COMBS ENTERPRISES LLC, BAD BOY ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., BAD BOY PRODUCTIONS HOLDINGS, INC., BAD BOY BOOKS HOLDINGS, INC., BAD BOY RECORDS LLC, BAD BOY ENTERTAINMENT LLC, BAD BOY PRODUCTIONS LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curis, Antigone) Modified on 12/23/2024 (jgo).
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, CE Opco, LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc., Individual Does 1-10, Organizational Does 1-10. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30367400)Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Antigone Curis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Combs
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daddy's House Recordings Inc.
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CE Opco, LLC doing business as Combs Global f/k/a Combs Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Records LLC
Represented By: William Laurence Charron
Represented By: Nicholas George Saady
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Productions LLC
Represented By: Michael Tremonte
Represented By: Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Represented By: Erica Ashley Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organizational Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?