Altice USA, Inc. et al v. OpSec Online LLC
Case Number: 1:2024mc00085
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: M 08-85 Motion to Compel

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER terminating 24 Motion re: 24 MOTION for Award of Costs Associated with Responding To Subpoena . The parties have resolved OpSec's motion for costs and, as previously indicated, they have no further issues regarding OpSec's compliance, see Letter, Dkt. 22. By not later than Monday, June 10, 2024, the parties must file a joint status letter indicating whether this case can be closed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 24. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/3/2024) (rro)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Compel. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Not later than Monday, April 1, 2024, Respondent must comply with Request 18 as described in th is Opinion. Not later than Friday, April 5, 2024, the parties must submit a joint status letter indicating whether they anticipate any further motion practice relative to the Subpoena and whether the case can be closed. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Docket Entry 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/19/2024) (tg)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by no later than 12:00 P.M. on Friday, March 15, 2024, the parties must meet and confer in person for at least one hour to resolve any remaining disputes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than 12:00 P.M. on Friday, March 15, 2024, the parties must submit a joint letter stating whether there are any remaining disputes; if there are, the letter must state specifically what documents are in dispute and include an explanation of each party's position on the dispute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/12/2024) (jca)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER with respect to 1 Letter Motion to Compel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Altice must serve a copy of the Motion and supporting documents on OpSec by not later than Wednesday, February 28, 2024, and file proof of service via ECF by not later than Th ursday, February 29, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, given the time sensitivity of the Motion and the upcoming discovery deadline in the Underlying Litigation, OpSec must respond to the Motion by not later than Wednesday, March 6, 2024. Altice may file a reply in support of its Motion by not later than Monday, March 11, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/26/2024) (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altice USA, Inc. et al v. OpSec Online LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?