In The Matter of The EX Parte Application of Karin Ingrid Reza For An Order To Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782
Case Number: 1:2024mc00442
Filed: October 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The conference scheduled for March 6, 2025 will now be held on March 13, 2025 at 1:00 PM using the same dial-in information. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/13/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/6/2025) (tg)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: For the reasons stated at the conference held on February 13, 2025, respondents must produce the relevant documents (addressed at the conference) by February 21, 2025. During the week of February 18, 2025, the parties should meet and confer i n good faith to determine whether they can reach agreement on other reasonable follow-up discovery that may be required, and how to resolve the parties' dispute to avoid litigation in multiple countries. If necessary, the Court will hold another conference on March 6, 2025 at 11:00 AM. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 740 500 853, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Arun Subramanian.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 2/13/2025) (sgz)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without prejudice 1 Motion For an Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Applicant's Application for an order to take discovery from: (i) JP Morgan Chase &Co.; (ii) J.P. Morgan Chase N.A.; (iii) J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; (iv) Prosiris GPLLC; (v) Prosiris Capital Management LP; and (vi) Reza Ali (collectively "Respondents"); is GRANTED without prejudice to any objection that Respondents may raise. 2. Applicant is ordered to serve a copy of this Order on Respondents. 3. Applicant is authorized, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782, to issue and serve the subpoenas substantially in the forms attached to the Declaration of Jonathan LeeBorsuk, subm itted in support of the Application, at Exhibits A through F. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for the purpose of enforcing this Order and assessing any supplemental request for discovery assistance. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Dkt. 1. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/3/2024) (vfr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of The EX Parte Application of Karin Ingrid Reza For An Order To Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?