Silva v. Schleifer et al
Plaintiff: Nathan C Silva
Defendant: Leonard S Schleifer, Bonnie L. Bassler, Michael S. Brown, N. Anthony Coles, Joseph L. Goldstein, Kathryn Guarini, Christine A. Poon, Arthur F. Ryan, David P Schenkein, George L. Sing, Craig B Thompson, George D. Yancopoulos, Huda Y. Zoghbi, Christopher Fenimore, Robert Landry and Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00459
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 78 j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2025 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Nathan C Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Brown, Timothy)
February 11, 2025 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Boehning, H.)
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Christopher Boehning on behalf of David P Schenkein, George L. Sing, Craig B Thompson, George D. Yancopoulos, Huda Y. Zoghbi, Christopher Fenimore, Robert Landry, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Leonard S Schleifer, Bonnie L. Bassler, Michael S. Brown, N. Anthony Coles, Joseph L. Goldstein, Kathryn Guarini, Christine A. Poon, Arthur F. Ryan..(Boehning, H.)
February 11, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Audra Jan Soloway on behalf of David P Schenkein, George L. Sing, Craig B Thompson, George D. Yancopoulos, Huda Y. Zoghbi, Christopher Fenimore, Robert Landry, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Leonard S Schleifer, Bonnie L. Bassler, Michael S. Brown, N. Anthony Coles, Joseph L. Goldstein, Kathryn Guarini, Christine A. Poon, Arthur F. Ryan..(Soloway, Audra)
January 21, 2025 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:25-cv-00145-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
January 21, 2025 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
January 21, 2025 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy)
January 17, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Timothy John MacFall to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Origin code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
January 17, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
January 17, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 17, 2025 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as possibly related to 25-cv-145. (jgo)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:25-cv-00145. Document filed by Nathan C Silva..(MacFall, Timothy)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacFall, Timothy) Modified on 1/17/2025 (jgo).
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bonnie L. Bassler, Michael S. Brown, N. Anthony Coles, Christopher Fenimore, Joseph L. Goldstein, Kathryn Guarini, Robert Landry, Christine A. Poon, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Arthur F. Ryan, David P Schenkein, Leonard S Schleifer, George L. Sing, Craig B Thompson, George D. Yancopoulos, Huda Y. Zoghbi. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30471151)Document filed by Nathan C Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification of Nathan Silva).(MacFall, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Schleifer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan C Silva
Represented By: Timothy John MacFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard S Schleifer
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie L. Bassler
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Brown
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Anthony Coles
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L. Goldstein
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Guarini
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A. Poon
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur F. Ryan
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Schenkein
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Sing
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig B Thompson
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George D. Yancopoulos
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huda Y. Zoghbi
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Fenimore
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Landry
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: H. Christopher Boehning
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?