Carnahan v. Baton Corporation Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Kendall Carnahan
Defendant: Baton Corporation Ltd. d/b/a Pump.Fun, Alon Cohen, Dylan Kerler and Noah Bernhard Hugo Tweedale
Case Number: 1:2025cv00490
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER terminating #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; terminating #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. This case is governed by special rules applicable to PSLRA, it should not have been scheduled for a conference. Please follow the statute. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/11/25) (yv)
March 10, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for April 10, 2025 and the Requirement to Meet and Confer and Submit Civil Case Management Plans Sine Die addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Chet B. Waldman dated March 10, 2025., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Lead Plaintiff Motions From March 18, 2025 to the Lead Plaintiff Motion Deadline in Aguilar of April 2, 2025 addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Chet B. Waldman dated March 10, 2025. Document filed by Kendall Carnahan..(Waldman, Chet)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/3/2025) (vfr)
January 23, 2025 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Noah Bernhard Hugo Tweedale..(jgo)
January 23, 2025 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dylan Kerler..(jgo)
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baton Corporation Ltd. d/b/a Pump.Fun..(jgo)
January 23, 2025 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alon Cohen..(jgo)
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Noah Bernhard Hugo Tweedale, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kendall Carnahan..(Waldman, Chet)
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dylan Kerler, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kendall Carnahan..(Waldman, Chet)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baton Corporation Ltd. d/b/a Pump.Fun, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kendall Carnahan..(Waldman, Chet)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alon Cohen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kendall Carnahan..(Waldman, Chet)
January 17, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Chet Barry Waldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
January 17, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 17, 2025 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 17, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Waldman, Chet)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baton Corporation Ltd. d/b/a Pump.Fun, Alon Cohen, Dylan Kerler, Noah Bernhard Hugo Tweedale. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30475407)Document filed by Kendall Carnahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-Addendum, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit K).(Waldman, Chet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnahan v. Baton Corporation Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Carnahan
Represented By: Chet Barry Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baton Corporation Ltd. d/b/a Pump.Fun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Kerler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Bernhard Hugo Tweedale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?