Carpio v. Caplan et al
Plaintiff: Mr Yoelin Carpio
Defendant: David L Caplan and Stephen B Caplan
Case Number: 1:2025cv00639
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 au Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:25-cv-01214, filed on 3/5/2025. (vba)
March 6, 2025 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:25-cv-01214, filed on 03/05/2025. (vba)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/5/2025) (sgz)
March 5, 2025 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Alexander Roytblat dated March 4, 2025 re: Request for conference before the Court on the issue of venue. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander)
March 5, 2025 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Pennsylvania.(sgz)
March 4, 2025 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Nameer S. Shukri, Esq. dated 03/04/2025 re: in Support of Dismissal Transfer Sanctions and Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email to Counsel).(Shukri, Nameer)
March 4, 2025 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#13) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Nameer S. Shukri dated 03/04/2025 re: in Support of Dismissal Transfer Sanctions and Extension of Time to Answer. Document filed by David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan..(Shukri, Nameer) Modified on 3/4/2025 (lb).
February 26, 2025 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Alexander Roytblat dated 2/26/2025 re: Bad faith letter to defense counsel and isurrer. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander)
February 25, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nameer Saad Shukri on behalf of David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan..(Shukri, Nameer)
February 24, 2025 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Defendants dated 2/24/25 re: Dismissal, Transfer, and Sanctions. Document filed by David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan..(Shukri, Nameer)
February 17, 2025 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Alexander Roytblat dated February 17, 2025 re: Reply to Honorable Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald's OTSC. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff show cause no later than February 21, 2025 as to why this action should not be transferred to either the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey or the. United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/11/2025) (sgz)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan..(pc)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David L. Caplan and Stephen B. Caplan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander)
January 23, 2025 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roytblat, Alexander)
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against David L Caplan, Stephen B Caplan. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander)
January 23, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Roytblat to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 23, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 23, 2025 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 23, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 23, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Roytblat. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000;. (jgo)
January 23, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alexander Roytblat. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
January 23, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexander Roytblat to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David L. Caplan and Stephen B. Caplan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yoelin Carpio..(Roytblat, Alexander) Modified on 1/23/2025 (jgo).
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30499593)Document filed by Yoelin Carpio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Roytblat, Alexander) Modified on 1/23/2025 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpio v. Caplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Yoelin Carpio
Represented By: Alexander Roytblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Caplan
Represented By: Nameer Saad Shukri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen B Caplan
Represented By: Nameer Saad Shukri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?