Joao v. Epic Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Joao
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Case Number: 1:2025cv00857
Filed: January 29, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference in this case, previously scheduled for March 20, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., see ECF No. 6, is ADJOURNED sine die pending the Court's resolution of Defendant's motion to transfer venue, see ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/10/2025) (tg)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER temporarily granting #32 Letter Motion to Seal. The motion to seal is granted temporarily. The Court will assess whether to keep the materials at issue sealed or redacted when deciding the underlying motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/10/25) (yv) Modified on 3/10/2025 (yv). (Main Document 33 replaced on 3/10/2025) (yv).
March 7, 2025 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Seal ECF Nos. 29, 30-1 and Redact ECF Nos.27, 28-1 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Ward dated March 7, 2025. Document filed by Raymond A. Joao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Raymond A. Joao).(Ward, David)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion to Seal. The motion to seal is granted temporarily. That said, mere agreement between the parties to keep a document confidential is not sufficient to keep a judicial document sealed or redacted. See, e.g., United States v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A., No. 12-CV-7527 (JMF), 2015 WL 3999074, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. June 30, 2015) (citing cases). Thus, if any party believes that the materials at issue should remain sealed or redacted, that party shall file a letter brief, within three days and not to exceed three pages, showing why doing so is consistent with the presumption in favor of public access to judicial documents. See generally Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 26. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/5/2025) (jjc)
March 4, 2025 Filing 30 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Bryce A. Loken in Support re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue)., #26 LETTER MOTION to Seal (Letter Motion to File Documents in Redacted Form) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated March 4, 2025.. Document filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Excerpts of Raymond Joao Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B- February 20-23, 2025 Emails)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #26 .(Loken, Bryce)
March 4, 2025 Filing 29 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue)., #26 LETTER MOTION to Seal (Letter Motion to File Documents in Redacted Form) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated March 4, 2025. . Document filed by All Parties. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #26 .(Loken, Bryce)
March 4, 2025 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Bryce A. Loken in Support re: #26 LETTER MOTION to Seal (Letter Motion to File Documents in Redacted Form) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated March 4, 2025., #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue).. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- (Redacted) Excerpts of Raymond Joao Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit B- February 20-23, 2025 Emails).(Loken, Bryce)
March 4, 2025 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #26 LETTER MOTION to Seal (Letter Motion to File Documents in Redacted Form) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated March 4, 2025., #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue). (Redacted). Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
March 4, 2025 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION to Seal (Letter Motion to File Documents in Redacted Form) addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated March 4, 2025. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between Plaintiff Raymond A. Joao and Defendant Epic Systems Corporation that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), the deadline for Epic to file its Amended Answer and/or add Counterclaims is extended from February 26, 2025 to the deadline for amended pleadings which will be set forth in the parties' forthcoming Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 02/26/2025) (yv)
February 25, 2025 Filing 24 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 19, 2025 Filing 23 DECLARATION of David A. Ward, Esq. in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue).. Document filed by Raymond A. Joao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 12-23-2024 Email between Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 12-27-2024 Amended Complaint).(Ward, David)
February 19, 2025 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Raymond A. Joao in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue).. Document filed by Raymond A. Joao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 Decapolis Articles of Organization, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 2024-12-07 Filed Complaint).(Ward, David)
February 19, 2025 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue). . Document filed by Raymond A. Joao..(Ward, David)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 19. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 3/4/2025. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/14/2025) (tg)
February 13, 2025 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue). addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Bryce A. Loken dated February 13, 2025. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, On February 5, 2025, Defendant filed a motion to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. ECF No. 14. Plaintiff's opposition, if any, shall not exceed twenty-five pages and must be filed by February 19, 2025. Defendant's reply, if any, shall not exceed ten pages and must be filed by February 26, 2025. SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 2/26/2025., Responses due by 2/19/2025) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/6/25) (yv)
February 5, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 5, 2025 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Bryce A. Loken in Support re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue).. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Federal Circuit Notice of Docketing, #2 Exhibit 2- Excerpts from Decapolis document production, #3 Exhibit 3- Post-Judgment Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Decapolis, #4 Exhibit 4- Subpoenas for Documents and Deposition to Raymond Joao, #5 Exhibit 5- Corporate information on Joao entities, #6 Exhibit 6- List of Decapolis and GreatGigz cases, #7 Exhibit 7- Reports on open cases, #8 Exhibit 8- Motion analytics reports, #9 Exhibit 9- Reports of Beteiro, Caselas and GreatGigz cases).(Loken, Bryce)
February 5, 2025 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue). . Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 5, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case (Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue). Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Loken, Bryce)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Bryce A. Loken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Kristin Graham Noel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Matthew J. Duchemin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
February 4, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Bryce A. Loken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30565543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryce A. Loken, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Loken, Bryce)
February 4, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Kristin Graham Noel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30565374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristin Graham Noel, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing - Wisconsin, #3 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Noel, Kristin)
February 4, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION for Matthew J. Duchemin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-30565149. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew J. Duchemin, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Duchemin, Matthew)
February 4, 2025 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Matthew J. Duchemin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-30565149. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
February 4, 2025 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Bryce A. Loken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30565543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
February 4, 2025 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Kristin Graham Noel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30565374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
February 3, 2025 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Raymond A. Joao on 2/3/2025. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Cohen, Mitchell)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/31/2025) (vfr)
January 30, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Allen Ward on behalf of Raymond A. Joao..(Ward, David)
January 30, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 30, 2025 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 30, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 29, 2025 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Cohen, Mitchell)
January 29, 2025 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING DIVERSITY INFORMATION - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation..(Cohen, Mitchell) Modified on 1/29/2025 (lb).
January 29, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Mitchell)
January 29, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 76437/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30533906).Document filed by Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal).(Cohen, Mitchell)
January 29, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Mitchell David Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here # NYSD form page (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joao v. Epic Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Joao
Represented By: David Allen Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mitchell David Cohen
Represented By: Matthew J Duchemin
Represented By: Bryce Loken
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?