Dreamgro Enterprises, LLC v. Ocean State Jobbers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DREAMGRO ENTERPRISES, LLC
Defendant: Ocean State Jobbers, Inc. and OCEAN STATE JOB LOT OF NEW YORK, INC.
Case Number: 1:2025cv01085
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2025 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gerry Grunsfeld dated April 6, 2025 re: Objecting to Defendants' pre-motion conference letter. Document filed by Dreamgro Enterprises, LLC..(Grunsfeld, Gerald)
April 6, 2025 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Dreamgro Enterprises, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Dreamgro Enterprises, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Grunsfeld, Gerald)
April 4, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from David B. Sunshine dated 04/04/2025 re: Request for Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc., Ocean State Jobbers, Inc...(Sunshine, David)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/12/2025) (sgz)
March 12, 2025 Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by Ocean State Jobbers, Inc., Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendants' application for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 9, is granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to April 4, 2025. Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc. answer due 4/4/2025; Ocean State Jobbers, Inc. answer due 4/4/2025. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/12/2025) (sgz)
March 11, 2025 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from David B. Sunshine dated 03/11/2025 re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Ocean State Jobbers, Inc., Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc...(Sunshine, David)
March 11, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David B. Sunshine on behalf of Ocean State Jobbers, Inc., Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc...(Sunshine, David)
February 10, 2025 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. April 17, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Courts Individual Rules. Initial Conference set for 4/17/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/7/2025) (sgz)
February 7, 2025 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Grunsfeld, Gerald)
February 7, 2025 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ocean State Job Lot of New York, Inc., Ocean State Jobbers, Inc...(jgo)
February 7, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Gerald Grunsfeld to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 7, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gerald Grunsfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DREAMGRO ENTERPRISES, LLC; OCEAN STATE JOB LOT OF NEW YORK, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
February 7, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gerald Grunsfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:44; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1051; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
February 7, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 7, 2025 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 7, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 6, 2025 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEAN STATE JOBBERS, INC.; OCEAN STATE JOB LOT OF NEW YORK, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by DREAMGRO ENTERPRISES, LLC..(Grunsfeld, Gerald)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Grunsfeld, Gerald)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCEAN STATE JOB LOT OF NEW YORK, INC., Ocean State Jobbers, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30579080)Document filed by DREAMGRO ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DREAMGRO TRADEMARK APPLICATION).(Grunsfeld, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreamgro Enterprises, LLC v. Ocean State Jobbers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREAMGRO ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Grunsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean State Jobbers, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN STATE JOB LOT OF NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: David B. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?