Brown-Allen v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Jeremye Brown-Allen
Defendant: Jonathan Torres, Willian Pachecocuzco, Matthew Barlow, Peter Delohery, Mark Matias, Sean Degnan and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2025cv01116
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter Local Civil Rule 83.10 and the Case Management Plan filed by City Of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned until 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM. Request otherwise denied. Counsel shall attend conference with settlement authority. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/2/25) (yv)
April 1, 2025 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Michael Viviano dated 4/1/25 re: Local Civil Rule 83.10 and the Case Management Plan. Document filed by City Of New York..(Viviano, Michael)
March 6, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Viviano on behalf of City Of New York..(Viviano, Michael)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Counsel receiving this order shall promptly mail copies hereof to all other counsel of record or, in the case of parties for which no appearance has been made, to such parties. 2. Counsel for all parties are directed to confer regarding an agreed scheduling order. If counsel are able to agree on a schedule and the agreed schedule calls for filing of the pretrial order not more than six (6) months from the date of this order, counsel shall sign and file by 4/2/2025 a consent order in the form annexed for consideration by the Court. If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided, a video conference invite will be emailed to counsel setting a video-conference on 4/9/2025 at 10:30 AM. 3. Any party desiring a conference with the Court for purposes of discussing settlement, narrowing of issues, or other pertinent pretrial matters may request a conference by letter. 4. Counsel should be aware that this case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing (ECF). It is the responsibility of counsel to become familiar with and follow ECF procedures. Information regarding the ECF system can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/5/2025) (jjc)
February 18, 2025 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Jonathan Torres served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Sergeant Castro. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 18, 2025 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Willian Pachecocuzco served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Principal Batts. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 18, 2025 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mark Matias served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Principal Batts. Document filed by Mark Matias..(Fu, Yan)
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Peter Delohery served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Principal Batts. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 18, 2025 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sean Degnan served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Principal Batts. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Matthew Barlow served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. Service was accepted by Principal Batts. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City Of New York served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 10, 2025 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Barlow, City Of New York, Sean Degnan, Peter Delohery, Mark Matias, Willian Pachecocuzco, Jonathan Torres..(pc)
February 10, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yan Fu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
February 10, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 10, 2025 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 10, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 10, 2025 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
February 7, 2025 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Jonathan Torres, Willian Pachecocuzco, Matthew Barlow, Peter Delohery, Mark Matias, and Sean Degnan, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fu, Yan)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Barlow, Sean Degnan, Peter Delohery, Mark Matias, Willian Pachecocuzco, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, Jonathan Torres. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30583721)Document filed by Jeremye Brown-Allen..(Fu, Yan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown-Allen v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremye Brown-Allen
Represented By: Yan Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willian Pachecocuzco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Delohery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Matias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Michael Viviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?