Carr v. Jacobson et al
Plaintiff: John Carr
Defendant: Tal Jacobson, Doron Gerstel, Maoz Sigron, Eyal Kaplan, Amir Guy, Rami Schwartz, Michael Drayman, Mike Vorhaus, Joy Marcus, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon and Perion Network, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2025cv01326
Filed: February 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2025 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Distribution Of Notice Of Initial Pretrial Conference re: #19 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,,,, Terminate Motions,,,. Document filed by John Carr..(McKenna, Thomas)
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:In accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") will be held on June 20, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. The IPTC will be held in Courtroom 20C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #13 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Notifying Court of Related Case and Requesting Transfer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dana M. Seshens dated April 4, 2025. filed by Mike Vorhaus, Perion Network, Ltd., Joy Marcus, Eyal Kaplan.( Initial Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/9/2025) (tg)
April 7, 2025 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
April 7, 2025 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge P. Kevin Castel is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
April 7, 2025 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02860-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
April 7, 2025 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dana M. Seshens and Gregory M. Egleston dated April 7, 2025 re: in Response to the Court's Order (ECF No. 7). Document filed by Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Mike Vorhaus..(Seshens, Dana)
April 7, 2025 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Eyal Kaplan waiver sent on 3/18/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
April 7, 2025 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joy Marcus waiver sent on 3/18/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
April 7, 2025 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mike Vorhaus waiver sent on 3/18/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
April 7, 2025 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Perion Network, Ltd. waiver sent on 3/18/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
April 4, 2025 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Notifying Court of Related Case and Requesting Transfer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dana M. Seshens dated April 4, 2025. Document filed by Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Mike Vorhaus..(Seshens, Dana)
April 4, 2025 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Perion Network, Ltd...(Seshens, Dana)
April 4, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Esther C. Townes on behalf of Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Mike Vorhaus..(Townes, Esther)
April 4, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund Polubinski, III on behalf of Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Mike Vorhaus..(Polubinski, Edmund)
April 4, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Meredith Seshens on behalf of Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Mike Vorhaus..(Seshens, Dana)
March 11, 2025 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Perion Network, Ltd. served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. Service was accepted by Mohamed Dansoko, Clerk. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-855-244-8681 Access Code: 2305 810 3970 #. Attention is called to Local Rule 1.8 that prohibits the recording or transmission of any proceeding. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/19/2025) (vfr)
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Drayman, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon, Doron Gerstel, Amir Guy, Tal Jacobson, Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Rami Schwartz, Maoz Sigron, Mike Vorhaus..(pc)
February 18, 2025 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Drayman, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon, Doron Gerstel, Amir Guy, Tal Jacobson, Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Rami Schwartz, Maoz Sigron, Mike Vorhaus..(pc)
February 14, 2025 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tal Jacobson, Doron Gerstel, Maoz Sigron, Eyal Kaplan, Amir Guy, Rami Schwartz, Michael Drayman, Mike Vorhaus, Joy Marcus, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon and Perion Network, LTD., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
February 14, 2025 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tal Jacobson, Doron Gerstel, Maoz Sigron, Eyal Kaplan, Amir Guy, Rami Schwartz, Michael Drayman, Mike Vorhaus, Joy Marcus, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon and Perion Network, LTD, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)
February 14, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 14, 2025 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 14, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 13, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Egleston, Gregory)
February 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Drayman, Dror Erez, Sarit Firon, Doron Gerstel, Amir Guy, Tal Jacobson, Eyal Kaplan, Joy Marcus, Perion Network, Ltd., Rami Schwartz, Maoz Sigron, Mike Vorhaus. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30617938)Document filed by John Carr..(Egleston, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Jacobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carr
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tal Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doron Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maoz Sigron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Kaplan
Represented By: Esther C. Townes
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rami Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Drayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Vorhaus
Represented By: Esther C. Townes
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Marcus
Represented By: Esther C. Townes
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dror Erez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarit Firon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perion Network, Ltd.
Represented By: Esther C. Townes
Represented By: Edmund Polubinski, III
Represented By: Dana Meredith Seshens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?