Melendez v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Plaintiff: Joseph Melendez
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Case Number: 1:2025cv01425
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 5/14/2025 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The public may dial in to the listen only line at (646)-453-4442 and enter access code 264130598#. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (rsh)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The conference will be rescheduled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 4/8/2025) (ar)
April 8, 2025 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Alan Muraidekh dated April 8, 2025. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
April 8, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The public may dial in to the listen only line at (646)-453-4442 and enter access code 264130598#. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (rsh) Modified on 4/8/2025 (rsh).
April 4, 2025 Filing 12 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joseph Melendez, Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/4/2025) (sgz)
April 1, 2025 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
April 1, 2025 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
March 27, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Patrick Constable on behalf of Joseph Melendez..(Constable, Sean)
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Mr. Constable, who signed the proposed order on behalf of Plaintiff, and Mr. Muraidekh, who signed the proposed order on behalf of Defendant, are both directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. After both counsel have done so, the Court will act on the parties' March 26, 2025 proposed order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/26/2025) (sgz)
March 26, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
February 21, 2025 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Metro-North Commuter Railroad waiver sent on 2/20/2025, answer due 4/21/2025. Document filed by Joseph Melendez..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. April 10, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Courts Individual Rules. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/20/2025) (sgz)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(jgo)
February 20, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 20, 2025 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 20, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Melendez..(Wietzke, Marc)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30645179)Document filed by Joseph Melendez..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Melendez
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Represented By: Sean Patrick Constable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?