Brady et al v. 102 E. 238th Street, LLC
Plaintiff: MARTIN BRADY and Maureen Brady
Defendant: 102 E. 238th Street, LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv01483
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arun Subramanian
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E530210053801 on 3/27/2025. (sgz)
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendants did not respond, and on March 11, 2025, the Court sua sponte extended the deadline to March 14, 2025. Dkt. 8. Again, the Court informed defendants that the case would be remanded without a satisfactory explanation. To date, defendants have not provided any such explanation. Accordingly, this case is remanded to the Supreme Court of New York, Bronx County. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/26/2025) (sgz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 25, 2025 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Steven Falkoff dated March 25, 2025 re: remand. Document filed by Maureen Brady..(Falkoff, Steven)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court ordered defendant to explain, by March 7, 2025, why the case should not be remanded based on the forum-defendant rule. If no explanation was given by that date, the Court warned, the case would be remanded without further notice. Dkt. 6. No such explanation has been provided to the Court. As a courtesy, the Court extends the deadline, nunc pro tunc, until March 14, 2025 at 5:00 PM. If defendant does not respond by this deadline, the case will be remanded. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 3/11/2025) (sgz)
February 28, 2025 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by 102 E. 238th Street, LLC..(Lanni, Jennifer)
February 28, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lanni to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading, the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. If you are filing documents from State Court that were not previously attached as exhibits to the Notice of Removal, please file them under State Court Records and Proceedings found under Other Filings, Other Documents. (pc)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by March 7, 2025, defendant explain to the Court why this case should not be remanded on the basis of the forum-defendant rule. If no explanation is made, the Court will remand the case without further notice. If defendant wishes to consent to remand, it may do so instead. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 2/27/2025) (tg)
February 27, 2025 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against 102 E. 238th Street, LLC. Document filed by Maureen Brady, Martin Brady..(Lanni, Jennifer) Modified on 2/28/2025 (pc).
February 27, 2025 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lanni, Jennifer)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Maureen Brady, Martin Brady.(Falkoff, Steven)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Craig Falkoff on behalf of Maureen Brady, Martin Brady..(Falkoff, Steven)
February 25, 2025 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
February 25, 2025 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (tro)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jennifer Lanni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MAUREEN C BRADY; MARTIN BRADY; 102 E. 238th STREET LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jennifer Lanni. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lanni. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 816983/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30663637).Document filed by 102 E. 238th STREET LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit Discovery Demands, #5 Exhibit Request for PC and RJI, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses).(Lanni, Jennifer)
February 24, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lanni. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 24, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Lanni to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 3/3/2025. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady et al v. 102 E. 238th Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN BRADY
Represented By: Steven Craig Falkoff
Represented By: Jennifer Lanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Brady
Represented By: Steven Craig Falkoff
Represented By: Jennifer Lanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 102 E. 238th Street, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?