Florence Rostami Law LLC v. Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Florence Rostami Law LLC
Defendant: Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2025cv01490
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number: 2:24-cv-11123. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
February 21, 2025 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba)
February 21, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (vba)
February 21, 2025 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
February 21, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (ECF NO. #12 ) AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
December 6, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Dismissal Or Transfer Due To Improper Venue filed by Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.. (Estenson, Samuel) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
November 22, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Dismissal Or Transfer Due To Improper Venue filed by Florence Rostami Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Florence Rostami, #3 Exhibit 1 to Rostami Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Rostami Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Rostami Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Rostami Declaration, #7 Exhibit Controlling Case 1, #8 Exhibit Controlling Case 2, #9 Exhibit Controlling Case 3, #10 Exhibit Controlling Case 4, #11 Exhibit Controlling Case 5, #12 Exhibit Controlling Case 6, #13 Exhibit Controlling Case 7, #14 Exhibit Controlling Case 8, #15 Exhibit Controlling Case 9, #16 Exhibit Controlling Case 10, #17 Exhibit Controlling Case 11, #18 Exhibit Controlling Statute) (Rostami, Florence) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
November 5, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Florence Rostami Law LLC (Rostami, Florence) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION. Reset Motion deadline as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Dismissal Or Transfer Due To Improper Venue: Response due by 11/22/2024. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
October 14, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative For Dismissal Or Transfer Due To Improper Venue by Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Naoki Takahashi, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Florence Rostami Law LLCs Motion for Withdrawal and Denying Request for Declaratory Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Florence Rostami Law LLC Retainer Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4- Florence Rostami Law LLC Gissing Litigation Budget) (Estenson, Samuel) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Responsive Pleading due by 10/14/2024. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 26, 2024 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 11:00 AM is Cancelled re #9 Notice to Appear. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 25, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L. Estenson on behalf of Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.. (Estenson, Samuel) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 3, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. Please see notice for call information. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #4 Application to proceed without local counsel filed by Florence Rostami Law LLC. Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
August 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal D Haber on behalf of Florence Rostami Law LLC. (Haber, Neal) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
August 29, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Florence Rostami Law LLC. (Rostami, Florence) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
August 29, 2024 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED OF THE OBLIGATION TO SPECIFY LOCAL COUNSEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 83.20(f) by Florence Rostami Law LLC. (Rostami, Florence) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2024. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.* (DJen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
April 30, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DJen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Florence Rostami Law LLC against Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9770200 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: New York - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Japan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Rostami, Florence) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/21/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florence Rostami Law LLC v. Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Rostami Law LLC
Represented By: Florence Rostami
Represented By: Neal D Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsuiya Industries Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Samuel L. Estenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?