Hazlett v. Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP
Plaintiff: John Hazlett
Defendant: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP, 101 Quincy LLC and Smart Management NY Inc
Case Number: 1:2025cv01558
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jennifer H Rearden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Application GRANTED. Defendant Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP shall respond to the Amended Complaint by May 7, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 12. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/11/2025) (jca)
April 11, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP answer due 5/7/2025. (jca)
April 10, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Kenneth A. Novikoff dated April 10, 2025. Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
April 10, 2025 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 101 Quincy LLC. (vf)
April 9, 2025 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 101 Quincy LLC, re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by John Hazlett..(Rahman, Hashim)
April 9, 2025 Filing 9 CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint, against 101 Quincy LLC, Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP, Smart Management NY Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hazlett. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Letter).(Rahman, Hashim)
April 9, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hashim Rahman to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 8, 2025 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hazlett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Letter).(Rahman, Hashim) Modified on 4/9/2025 (pc).
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Application GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by April 9, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 3/6/2025) (jca)
March 6, 2025 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Kenneth A. Novikoff dated March 6, 2025. Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
March 6, 2025 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP answer due 4/9/2025. (jca)
March 4, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hashim Rahman on behalf of John Hazlett..(Rahman, Hashim)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Louis Schleifer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Louis Schleifer on behalf of Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Schleifer, William)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth A. Novikoff on behalf of Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 659817/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30665691).Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Summons and Complaint).(Novikoff, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazlett v. Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hazlett
Represented By: Hashim Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP
Represented By: Kenneth A. Novikoff
Represented By: William Louis Schleifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 101 Quincy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Management NY Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?