Blau v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Blau
Defendant: Shlomo Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JDA Holdings LLC, John Doe 1 through 20, Jane Doe 1 Through 10 and ABC Corporations 1 Through 10
Case Number: 1:2025cv01562
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2025 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yakov Anisfeld, Shlomo Fisher, Samuel Gratt, JDA Holdings LLC, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., Arthur Spitzer. (sj)
March 31, 2025 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shlomo Fisher a/k/a Sol Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JDA Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Abraham Blau..(Martinez, Christian)
March 28, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name must match pleading exactly in docket entry (JDA Holdings LLC). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 27, 2025 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shlomo Fisher a/k/a Sol Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JD Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Abraham Blau. (Martinez, Christian) Modified on 3/28/2025 (sj).
March 26, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong Filing Court reflected on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 25, 2025 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shlomo Fisher a/k/a Sol Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JD Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Abraham Blau..(Martinez, Christian) Modified on 3/26/2025 (jgo).
March 24, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant's name as to whom the summons request is for must match exactly as pleading in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 21, 2025 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shlomo Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JD Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Abraham Blau. (Martinez, Christian) Modified on 3/24/2025 (sj).
March 19, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Standard Summons form dated 6/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
March 18, 2025 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Martinez, Christian)
March 18, 2025 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shlomo Fisher, Arthur Spitzer, Samuel Gratt, Yakov Anisfeld, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., JD Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Abraham Blau. (Martinez, Christian) Modified on 3/19/2025 (sj).
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER For the reasons expressed in the Court's March 5, 2025 Order (Doc. 3), and because Plaintiff has failed to amend the Complaint as directed, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Manhattan courthouse. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/11/2025) (jca)
March 11, 2025 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(tro)
March 11, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. SECOND Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
March 11, 2025 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER This matter has recently been reassigned to me. Rule 18(a)(3) of the Southern District of New York's Rules for the Division of Business provides for circumstances when a civil case shall be designated for assignment to White Plains, and when it may be designated for assignment to White Plains. The Complaint in this matter alleges that the subject property is located in New Jersey and that Plaintiff, as well as Defendants Fisher, Spitzer, Gratt, Anisfeld, and Muller are residents of New Jersey. (Doc. 2 paragraph 1, 7-12). While the Complaint alleges that the other Defendants are citizens of the State of New York (id. paragraph 13-24), the Complaint does not otherwise identify whether the claim arose in any part of the Northern Counties or whether any of the parties reside in the Northern Counties. Indeed, based on the Civil Cover Sheet (Doc. 2-4), it appears that the New York parties are located in the counties of Queens and New York. The foregoing suggests that the case must be assigned to Manhattan. Plaintiff is therefore directed to, by March 10, 2025, either: 1) amend the complaint to specify what part of the claim arose out of the Northern Counties or which parties reside in the Northern Counties such that the case should be assigned to the White Plains courthouse, or 2) inform the Court via letter that the case should more properly be assigned to Manhattan. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2025.) (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/5/2025) (jca)
March 4, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 4, 2025 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 4, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 4, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christian Nelson Martinez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 370 (Other Fraud); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 470 (Racketeer/Corrupt Organization); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
March 4, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Nature of Suit codes was selected; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes was selected; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo) Modified on 3/4/2025 (jgo).
March 3, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporations 1 Through 10, Yakov Anisfeld, Shlomo Fisher, Samuel Gratt, JDA Holdings LLC, Jane Doe 1 Through 10, John Doe 1 through 20, Jacob Muller, S&W Metals Inc., Arthur Spitzer. Document filed by Abraham Blau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1_Mortgage recorded 1-18-22, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2_Affidavit indicating in london, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3_Deed record January 2022, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Martinez, Christian)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the pleading must be filed as the main document; remove the first page. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/3/2025. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Christian Nelson Martinez. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Abraham Blau. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30666226)Document filed by Abraham Blau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1_Mortgage recorded 1-18-22, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2_Affidavit indicating in london, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3_Deed record January 2022).(Martinez, Christian) Modified on 2/25/2025 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blau v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Blau
Represented By: Christian Nelson Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlomo Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakov Anisfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&W Metals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDA Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?