Wei v. Wang et al
Plaintiff: Tianyi Wei
Defendant: Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu, James Huang, Bridge Investment Group, Erik Fangshen Wang, Jacky Meng, Xiao Bing, Huang Jin, Canbo International Group, Ltd., Beijing Canbo Geli International Consulting, Ltd., Phillip T. Mendiola Long, Rudy Asuncion Pamintuan, American Northern Marianas Regional Center, American Northern Marianas Economic Development Fund LLC, BIG, Beijing Jiabao Zhouli Consulting Co., Ltd. and Beijing GeLi Law Firm
Case Number: 1:2025cv01567
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL... The Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Any pending motions are moot and any conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/6/25) (yv)
March 4, 2025 Filing 7 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #5 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Tianyi Wei..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
March 4, 2025 Filing 6 FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against American Northern Marianas Regional Center, Bridge Investment Group, Canbo International Group, Ltd., James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu, Erik Fangshen Wang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tianyi Wei. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - USCIS Decision Denying MRC EB-5 Program 10 29 2024, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - PowerPoint Presentation, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Redline Comparing Original Complaint and FAC).(Postlethwaite, Preston) Modified on 3/4/2025 (jgo).
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against American Northern Marianas Regional Center, Bridge Investment Group, Canbo International Group, Ltd., James Huang, Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu, Erik Fangshen Wang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Tianyi Wei. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - USCIS Decision Denying MRC EB-5 Program 10 29 2024, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - PowerPoint Presentation).(Postlethwaite, Preston)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff must allege both the principal place of business and state of incorporation of all corporate defendants. No later than March 5, 2025, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of each party to this action. If, by that date, Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint establishing this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice and without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/26/2025) ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2025.) (ks)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/5/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/26/2025) (ks)
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Postlethwaite, Preston)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Preston James Postlethwaite. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
February 25, 2025 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Preston James Postlethwaite. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Phillip Mendiola Long, Rudy Pamintuan - party name contained a typographical error; BEIJING CANBO GELI INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING, LTD - party name was entered in all caps; Xianjun Meng, Silvia Siu, Bridge Investment Group, James Huang - alias party name was omitted. (gp)
February 25, 2025 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
February 25, 2025 Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
February 25, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Northern Marianas Economic Development Fund LLC, American Northern Marianas Regional Center, BEIJING CANBO GELI INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING, LTD, Beijing GeLi Law Firm, Beijing Jiabao Zhouli Consulting Co., Ltd., Bridge Investment Group, Canbo International Group, Ltd., James Huang, Phillip Mendiola Long, Xianjun Meng, Rudy Pamintuan, Silvia Siu, Erik Wang. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30667265)Document filed by Tianyi Wei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - USCIS Decision Denying MRC EB-5 Program 10 29 2024, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - PowerPoint Presentation).(Postlethwaite, Preston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wei v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xianjun Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Siu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Fangshen Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacky Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao Bing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huang Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canbo International Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing Canbo Geli International Consulting, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip T. Mendiola Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Asuncion Pamintuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Northern Marianas Regional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Northern Marianas Economic Development Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing Jiabao Zhouli Consulting Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing GeLi Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianyi Wei
Represented By: Preston James Postlethwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?