Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Travis Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2025cv01670
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dale E Ho
Referring Judge: Henry J Ricardo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Allison Zeidler on behalf of Travis Harris..(Zeidler, Melissa)
April 1, 2025 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Candace Brown Casey dated 4/1/25 re: parties to not consent to proceedings before a magistrate judge. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
March 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #13 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. Plaintiff's motion for counsel is DENIED without prejudice to renewal at a later date. In addition to the information mailed to Plaintiff on March 13, 2025, Plaintiff is advised that there is a Pro Se Law Clinic available to assist self-represented parties in civil cases. The Clinic may be able to provide a pro se party with advice in connection with their case. The Pro Se Law Clinic is run by a private organization called the City Bar Justice Center; it is not part of, or run by, the Court (and, among other things, therefore cannot accept filings on behalf of the Court, which must still be made by any self-represented party through the Pro Se Intake Unit). Litigants in need of legal assistance should complete the City Bar Justice Center's intake form available at https://www.citybarjusticecenter.org/projects/federal-pro-se-legal-assistance-proiect/ to make an appointment. If a litigant has questions about the intake form or needs to highlight an urgent deadline already disclosed in the form, the clinic can be contacted by phone (212-382-4794 ) or email (fedprosdny@nycbar.org). In-person appointments in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse in Manhattan are available Monday through Thursday, 10:00 a.m. to 4:00 p.m. Appointments are also available remotely Monday through Friday, 10:00 a.m. to 4:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the application at ECF No. 13 as DENIED without prejudice.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 3/31/2025) (sgz)
March 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction is extended to April 9, 2025. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/28/2025) (ks)
March 26, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Travis Harris. New Address: 929 Courtlandt Avenue, Bronx, NY, 10451. (ar)
March 26, 2025 Filing 13 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Travis Harris. (ar)
March 24, 2025 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file consent to magistrate judge form addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Candace Brown Casey dated March 24, 2025. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
March 13, 2025 Social Security Information Mailed: Social Security Information Packet mailed to Travis Harris on 3/13/2025. The Social Security Information Packet included: Instructions for Seeking Judicial Review of a Final Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security; Statement Regarding Notice to the Commissioner of Social Security; Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files; New York Legal Action Groups flyer about the free legal assistance clinic at the courthouse; New York County Lawyers Association flyer about pro bono attorneys who practice in the area of Social Security litigation; Individual practices of the assigned District and Magistrate Judges; Handout explaining matters handled by Magistrate Judges; Consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge; Consent form to receive court filings electronically; Motion form to receive permission to file cases electronically; Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes; Standing Order M 10-468 on Briefing of Social Security Cases. (nb)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/12/2025) (sgz)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: By separate Order today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. As the case involves a challenge to a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security it is subject to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions and Chief Judge Swain's Standing Order Regarding Briefing of Social Security Cases. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/12/2025) (sgz)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/11/2025) (sac)
March 11, 2025 Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
March 11, 2025 NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY ACTION. The Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York are hereby notified of the commencement of this action. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 5/12/2025. (vba)
March 11, 2025 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Dale E. Ho. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
February 28, 2025 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Travis Harris on 02/28/2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
February 28, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Candace Brown Casey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Brown Casey, Candace)
February 28, 2025 CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see #Rule 9.2 of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(tro)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER IN RE BRIEFING OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 22-MISC-329 Standing Order filed November 21, 2022). WHEREAS, cases filed on and after December 1, 2022 under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), seeking judicial review on the record of final decisions by the Commissioner of Social Security ("Commissioner") denying applications for social security benefits, are governed by the simplified procedures set forth in the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions ("Supplemental Rules" or "Supp. R.");... in order to ensure the efficient disposition of cases subject to the Supplemental Rules, it is hereby ORDERED that, prior to seeking an extension of any deadline set forth in Supp. R. 4, 6, 7, or 8, the party seeking such extension shall attempt to meet and confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to agree upon a reasonable and comprehensive schedule for all future filings in the case. If the parties reach agreement, the proposed schedule shall be presented to the Court for approval and, if approved, will govern all remaining proceedings in the case.... (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (tro)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Travis Harris consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Travis Harris..(tro)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may #consent to electronic service to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for #permission to file documents electronically. Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (tro) Modified on 2/28/2025 (tro).
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Travis Harris.(tro)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Travis Harris.(tro)
February 25, 2025 Case Designated ECF. (tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Harris
Represented By: Melissa Allison Zeidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Candace Brown Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?