In Re: Trafigura Pte Ltd
Case Number: 1:2025mc00041
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: M 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AUTHORIZING ADDITIONAL SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 granting 13 Letter Motion for Discovery. It is hereby: ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; ORDERED that Trafigura may serve an additional subpoena substantially in the form attached to the application on UBS AG, Stamford Branch; and ORDERED that Trafigura need not serve copies of the subpoena on the defendants in the English proceeding. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/11/2025) (vfr)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: 11 LETTER MOTION for Discovery (Motion for Entry of Protective Order) addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Robert K. Kry dated February 19, 2025. filed by Trafigura Pte Ltd. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/20/2025) (tg)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 granting 1 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby: ORDERED that ex parte consideration of the Application is appropriate; ORDERED that the Application is GRANTED; ORDERED that Trafigura is authorized to serve subpoenas substantially in the form attached to the Application on each proposed respondent; and ORDERED that Trafigura need not serve copies of the subpoenas on the defendants in the English proceeding. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/31/2025) (vfr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Trafigura Pte Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?