Yang v. Navigators Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jennifer Yang
Defendant: Navigators Group, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2013cv02073
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Presiding Judge: Lisa Margaret Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION AND ORDER re: 115 MOTION in Limine . filed by Navigators Group, Inc., 112 MOTION in Limine . filed by Jennifer Yang. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion in limine is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff� 39;s motions in limine are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: Defendant's mitigation expert testimony is preliminarily limited in accordance with this Opinion, and Defendant's witnesses may not testify via a live video feed. The Court r espectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 112 & 115. The parties are directed to appear at the previously scheduled final pretrial conference on May 19, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/18/2017) (rj)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER re: 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Navigators Group, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk to terminate the motion at ECF No. 84 and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/4/2016) (mml)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Yang, 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Navigators Group, Inc. For the stated reasons, Plaintiffs cross-moti on to amend the complaint is GRANTED and Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motions (Docs. 31 & 46). Plaintiff is directed to file its second amended complaint on or before May 31, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2014.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/8/2014) (mml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Navigators Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Yang
Represented By: Daniel Jordan Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Kiman
Represented By: A Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?