Clemmons, Jr. v. Lee
Plaintiff: Andre Clemmons, Jr.
Defendant: William A. Lee
Case Number: 7:2013cv04969
Filed: July 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: On February 24, 2021, the Court directed Respondent to respond to Petitioner's amendment by March 24, 2021. (Docket No. 50). To date, the Court has received no such response. Respondent must submit a response by April 14, 2021 or th e amendment will be deemed unopposed. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Petitioner. So Ordered. (Responses due by 4/14/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/31/2021) (js) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. On February 22, 2021, Petitioner filed an amendment to his habeas corpus petition. (Docket No. 49). Respondent is directed to respond to the amendment by March 24, 2021. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Petitioner. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/24/2021) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Petitioner has informed the Court that he has exhausted his state court remedies with respect to his New York Criminal Procedure Law § 440.10 motion to vacate judgment (see Docket No. 46), therefore, the stay in this matter is lifted. On August 6, 2020, the Court directed to Respondent to respond to Petitioner's request to amend his habeas corpus petition. (Docket No. 47). Having received no opposition to Petitioner's letter, Petitioner's request is granted. Petitioner may file an amended petition and must do so by February 19, 2021. If no amended petition is received, the Court will decide the case based on the current record. The Clerk is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Petitioner. So ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2021.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/13/2021) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemmons, Jr. v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Clemmons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?