Ceara v. Doe
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceara
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 7:2013cv06023
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 153 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/7/21) (yv)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of September 6, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/3/2021) (cf)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of June 14, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (US A toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall m ail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/11/2021) (nb)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Granted. The Court will hold a status conference on Friday, June 18, 2021 at 12:00 P.M. So Ordered. ( Status Conference set for 6/18/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/5/21) (yv)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of April 19, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/16/2021) (kv)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for a status conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, April 20, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call the foll owing number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/7/2021) (cf)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING PRO BONO COUNSEL: For the foregoing reasons, the Clerk of Court is directed to attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at his upcoming trial described above. The Court advises Plaintiff that there are no funds to retain counsel in civil cases and the Court relies on volunteers. Due to a scarcity of volunteer attorneys, a lengthy period of time may pass before counsel volunteers to represent Plaintiff. If an attorney volunteers, the attorney will contact P laintiff directly. There is no guarantee, however, that a volunteer attorney will decide to take the case, and Plaintiff should be prepared to proceed with the case without an attorney. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/9/2020) (jca) Transmission to Office of Pro Se Litigation for processing.
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of November 2, 2020, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Num ber (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se case s shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Fo r initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/30/2020) (jca)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of July 20, 2020, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (U SA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shal l mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initi al conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/17/2020) (jca)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of April 20, 2020, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (U SA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above- referenced number. For init ial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/16/2020) (ks)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION & ORDER re: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment: the Court grants Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 44), enter judgment for Defendant, and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/23/2017) (lnl)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER: In light of the foregoing analysis, the Court denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 17.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/25/2014) (See OPINION AND ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceara v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?