Downing v. Tappan Zee Constructors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Downing
Defendant: Tappan Zee Constructors, LLC, Traylor Bros., Inc., The Tug Prospector and The Material Barge
Case Number: 7:2016cv01114
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vincent L. Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The tentative trial date of October 25, 2021, is cancelled. 2. The final pre-trial conference currently scheduled for October 13, 2021, is adjourned without date. 3. By September 14, 2021, counsel sh all file a joint letter proposing three dates on or after January 19, 2022, at which all parties will be available to proceed with a 12-day jury trial. 4. All other deadlines set in the Court's April 12, 2021, Order, as modified by subsequent text orders, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/31/2021) (mml)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER: As discussed at a telephone conference held on February 25, 2021, attended by counsel for all parties, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The next conference in this case shall take place on April 2, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall use the foll owing information to connect by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662; Access Code: 1703567. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/25/2021) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (ks)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER: As discussed at a telephone conference held on December 3, 2020, attended by counsel for all parties, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The next conference in this case shall take place on February 25, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall use the following information to connect by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662; Access Code: 1703567. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/3/2020) (jca)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The next conference in this case shall take place on December 3, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. The parties shall use the following information to connect by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662; Access Code: 1703567. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/21/2020) (va)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 OPINION AND ORDER re: 274 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Baruch Berzon, M.D., Phelps Memorial Hospital, Northwell Health Inc., 266 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Lee, M.D., 271 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Baruch Berzon, M.D., Phelps Memorial Hospital, Northwell Health Inc., 257 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of defendant, Sanda Carniciu, M.D. filed by Sanda Carniciu, M.D.. The motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Drs. Lee and Carniciu's request for a hearing to determine the reliability and admissibility of plaintiff's medical experts' testimony is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All counsel are directed to appear at a case management conference on September 16, 2020, at 2:30 p.m., at which time the Court expects to set a trial date and a schedule for pre-trial submissions. Counsel shall also be prepared to discuss whether this case should be referr ed to the magistrate judge or to a mediator for settlement purposes. The September 16, 2020, conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel shall attend by calling the following number and entering the access code when requested: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662 Access Code: 1703567 The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motions. (Docs. ##257, 266, 271, 274). (Telephone Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/7/2020) (nb)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER: Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff shall submit a letter to the Court, not to exceed ten pages, explaining itsposition respecting subject matter jurisdiction by April 17, 2020 2. The Medical Defendants may submit a joint respon se, not to exceed ten pages, explaining their position respecting subject matter jurisdiction by May 1, 2020. In their letter, the Medical Defendants shall note any disagreements among the defendants on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/3/2020) (cf)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, the Johnsen report shall be not precluded, and plaintiffs request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/19/2018) (mml)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPINION AND ORDER re: 91 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Westchester County Healthcare Corp. Defendant WCHC's motion to dismiss the third amended complaint against it is GRANTED. Defendant WCHC's motion to dismiss the cross-claim filed against it by TZC is DENIED. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the pending motion. (Doc. #91). So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/13/17) (yv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing v. Tappan Zee Constructors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Downing
Represented By: Timothy Francis Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tappan Zee Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Mary Catherine Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traylor Bros., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tug Prospector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Material Barge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?