Nadeau v. Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation
Plaintiff: Nadeau and Janice Nadeau
Defendant: Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation
Case Number: 7:2016cv07986
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The Court finds that the settlement is fair and reasonable, and the product of arm's-length negotiation, not fraud or collusion. Moreover, the Court finds the attorney's fees to be fair and reasonable under the circumstances, as the fees requested amount to less than 6% of the lodestar in this case. Accordingly, the parties' settlement agreement (Doc. #68-1) is hereby APPROVED. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/17/2018) (jwh)
April 16, 2018 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated April 16, 2018 re: Requesting Judicial Approval of the Settlement Agreement and General Release. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Settlement Agreement and General Release, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson, #3 Exhibit C-Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Traub, Amy)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: By 4/16/2018 the parties shall either file a stipulation of dismissal or submit a status report regarding settlement. All other deadlines are stayed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
April 5, 2018 Filing 66 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated April 5, 2018. Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Letter Motion to Stay: By no later than 4/9/2018, the parties shall either file a stipulation of dismissal or submit a status report regarding settlement. In the meantime, all deadlines are stayed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
March 9, 2018 Filing 64 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay all current deadlines pending settlement addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated 03/09/2018. Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
March 2, 2018 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/28/2017 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sabrina D'Emidio, (914) 390-4053. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2018.(D'Emidio, Sabrina)
March 2, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 07/28/2017 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(D'Emidio, Sabrina)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Having reviewed both the letter-motion and defendant's response thereto, the requested extension is GRANTED. Plaintiff's opposition is due 3/9/2018. Defendant's reply is due 3/23/2018. The Court does not view plaintiff's request as "accusing defendant of felony forgery." (Doc. #60). Nor is a 3 week extension unreasonable. By granting the extension, however, the Court expresses no view as to whether the handwriting expert's opinion will or will not be considered in deciding the motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
February 7, 2018 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated February 7, 2018 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
February 7, 2018 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations - Renewed. addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated February 7, 2018. Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. On January 29, 2018, defendant filed a renewed motion to strike class and collective action allegations. (Doc. #55). Therefore, in accordance with the Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (Doc. #54), the conference scheduled for February 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. is HEREBY CANCELED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/1/18) (yv)
January 29, 2018 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations - Renewed. . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
January 29, 2018 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Lisa Leib in Support re: #55 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations - Renewed.. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Arbitration Agreements, #2 Exhibit B. Court Minutes)(Traub, Amy)
January 29, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations - Renewed. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. This case is to be tried to a jury. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) shall be completed by 10/10/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 10/26/2017. Motions due by 1/29/2018. Deposition due by 12/29/2017. Requests to Admit shall be served no later than 11/27/2017. Fact Discovery due by 12/29/2017. Defendant shall produce the following documents by 10/26/2017: Signed arbitration agreements for all non-exempt employees identified pursuant to paragraphs 6(b)(v) and 6(b)(vi) below; All written decisions compelling arbitration/testing enforceability of defendant's employment arbitration agreements; A list of all employment arbitrations with the American Arbitration Association pursuant to defendant's arbitration agreements; Available invoices and proofs of payment for employment arbitrations identified in paragraphs 6(b)(ii) and 6(b)(iii) above; List of all non-exempt employees employed in the State of New York from October 12, 2010, to present; List of all non-exempt employees employed outside the State of New York from November 21, 2013, to present. Interrogatories, if any, shall be served no later than October 26, 2017, and responses thereto shall be served within thirty days thereafter. The provisions of Local Civil Rule 33.3 shall not apply. Discovery due by 12/29/2017. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/26/17) (yv)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. By September 19, 2017, each side shall submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order in accordance with the Court's order dated July 28, 2017. (Doc. #51). The proposed scheduling orders shall include specific proposed deadlines. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/12/17) (yv)
August 11, 2017 Filing 52 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying without prejudice #40 Motion to Strike. Defendant's motion to strike class and collective action allegations under Rule 23(d)(1)(D) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal after the discovery period discussed below. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #40). By August 11, 2017, counsel shall submit a joint letter regarding a discovery schedule for the purpose of determining the existence and/or enforceability of potential class members' arbitration agreements and class-and collective-action waivers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/28/17) (yv)
July 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Bench Ruling on 7/28/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina D'Emidio)Order to follow. (dh)
July 26, 2017 Filing 50 CALENDAR NOTICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the above-captioned case has been re-scheduled for Status conference on 7-28-2017, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 620, United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601. Adjourned from 7-28-2017 at 9:30. ( Status Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/26/2017) (mro)
July 13, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
July 13, 2017 Mediator Session Held on 7/12/2017 at White Plains Courthouse.(mf)
June 16, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
June 15, 2017 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 7/12/2017, 10:00 AM at the U.S. Courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street White Plains, NY 10601.(cda)
June 9, 2017 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
June 9, 2017 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Plainitff's opposition due 6/9/2017. Defendant's reply due 6/16/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
May 24, 2017 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint. addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated May 24, 2017. Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
May 18, 2017 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Lisa Leib in Support re: #40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint.. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Orders)(Traub, Amy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Strike Class and Collective Action Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. So Ordered. (Attorney Difie Osborne terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/8/17) (yv)
May 5, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Difie M. Osborne to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Osborne, Difie)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and to stay this action is DENIED. The Court's Order of November 23, 2016, staying the Mediation Referral Order (Doc. #8) pending a decision on the instant motion (Doc. #23) is VACATED. The parties are directed to contact the assigned mediator and proceed promptly to mediation in accordance with the Mediation Referral Order. The initial conference originally scheduled for February 2, 2017 (Doc. #9), is re-scheduled for July 28, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the motion. (Doc. #16). ( Initial Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/4/2017) (rj)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #34 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated January 27, 2017 re: Seeking Clarification of Order dated November 23, 2016. ENDORSEMENT The 2/2/2017 conference is adjourned without date, pending the decision on the motion to compel arbitration. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/27/2017) (lnl)
January 27, 2017 Terminate Mediation Case Tracking Deadlines: Mediator Schedule Deadline (rpr)
January 27, 2017 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated January 27, 2017 re: Seeking Clarification of Order dated November 23, 2016. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
January 19, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dominic Sardesai-Grant on behalf of Janice Nadeau. (Sardesai-Grant, John)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Sur-reply is not necessary. In the event defendant improperly submitted new information, documents or arguments in its reply, the Court will ignore same. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
January 18, 2017 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a sur-reply in response to defendants Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration. addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated January 18, 2017. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
January 6, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Amy J. Traub, Esq. in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Arbitration Demand of Janice Nadeau, #2 Exhibit B: Email from the American Arbitration Association dated December 2, 2016)(Traub, Amy)
January 6, 2017 Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
December 21, 2016 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Frei-Pearson in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Endorsed Letter Order)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
December 21, 2016 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Janice Nadeau in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AAA Rules, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 3, 2016 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 10, 2016 Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 20-23, 2016 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - July 18, 2016 Correspondence)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
December 21, 2016 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to compel arbitration due 12/21/2016. Defendant's reply due 1/6/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
December 2, 2016 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defenant's Motion addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated December 2, 2016. Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 5/5/2017, Doc. #36 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion to Stay: There is good cause to stay the Court's 11/4/2016 Mediation Referral Order (Doc. #8) pending a decision on the motion to compel arbitration. In the event the motion to compel is granted, the case will be stayed pending arbitration. In the event the motion to compel is denied, the case will proceed in court without undue delay. Accordingly, the Mediation Referral Order is stayed pending further order of the Court. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent) Modified on 5/10/2017 (rj).
November 22, 2016 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated November 22, 2016 re: Reply To Defendant's Novemeber 21, 2016 Letter-Motion. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER deferring ruling on #20 Letter Motion to Stay: By 11/28/2016, plaintiff's counsel shall respond by letter to the letter-motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
November 21, 2016 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION to Stay Order dated November 4, 2016 and Notice of Initial Conference dated November 7, 2016 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated November 21, 2016. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
November 21, 2016 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equity Residential for Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
November 21, 2016 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Mary Pawlisa in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Offer Letter to Janice Nadeau dated February 13, 2015, #2 Exhibit B: Arbitration Agreement to Janice Nadeau, #3 Exhibit C: Excerpts from Employee Handbook of Equity Residential, #4 Exhibit D: Acknowledgment Form signed by Janice Nadeau)(Traub, Amy)
November 21, 2016 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
November 21, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
November 17, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Gregory Blankinship on behalf of Janice Nadeau. (Blankinship, Douglas)
November 15, 2016 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 12/15/2016.(cda)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for John C. McIlwee to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/14/2016) (lnl)
November 9, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for John Conlaeth McIlwee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McIlwee, John)
November 9, 2016 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Conlaeth McIlwee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12967751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McIlwee, John) Modified on 11/9/2016 (wb).
November 9, 2016 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation served on 10/18/2016, answer due 11/8/2016. Service was accepted by Ana I. Ochoa, Senior Paralegal. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Osborne, Difie)
November 9, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Difie Osborne on behalf of Janice Nadeau. (Osborne, Difie)
November 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for John Conlaeth McIlwee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12967751. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
November 9, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for John Conlaeth McIlwee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 7, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Conference: Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (fk)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/14/2016. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/3/16) (mf) Modified on 5/5/2017 (rj). Modified on 5/10/2017 (rj).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint extended to 11/21/2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent)
November 3, 2016 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Amy J. Traub dated November 3, 2016. Document filed by Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation.(Traub, Amy)
November 3, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (vf)
October 12, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Janice Nadeau. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
October 12, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201. (vf)
October 12, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
October 12, 2016 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (vf)
October 12, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 12, 2016 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Janice Nadeau. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
October 12, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
October 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12862983)Document filed by Janice Nadeau.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadeau v. Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Residential Properties Management Corporation
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Nadeau
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Represented By: John Dominic Sardesai-Grant
Represented By: Difie Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?