Wilson v. HSBC Bank, USA et al
Plaintiff: Sherwin A. Wilson
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA, Mortgageit, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Prudential Rand Realty, Inc., All persons and entities with an interest in real property located at 4 William Street, Ossining, New York and Does 1-100
Case Number: 7:2016cv08405
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION & ORDER re: 59 MOTION to Dismiss RE-FILE of Document 56 filed by HSBC Bank, USA. For the forgoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's FCRA claims as against HSBC is GRANTED in its entirety. Given the Court's Opinion and Order dated March 22, 2018, which dismissed all claims against Defendants Mortgageit, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Prudential Rand Realty, Inc., and Does 1-100, with prejudice, any claims asser ted in the Amended Complaint against them are similarly dismissed. The Amended Complaint is deemed dismissed in its entirety. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Opinion to pro se Plaintiff, show proof of service on the docket, terminate the motion at ECF No. 59, and terminate the action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/1/2019) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION & ORDER re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., HSBC Bank, USA, 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Letter Plainitff's Cross-Motion to Amend the Complain t, filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., HSBC Bank, USA. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is granted, with leave to amend only the second part of Plaintiff's claim arising under the FCRA as explaine d above. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 25 & 35, mail a copy of this Opinion and Order to pro se Plaintiff at the address below, and file proof of service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate Defendants MortgageIT, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Prudential Rand Realty, Inc., all persons with an interest in real property located at 4 William Street, Ossining, New York, and Does 1-100. Plaint iff is directed to file an Amended Complaint in conformance with the above on or before May 21, 2018. Failure to timely file an Amended Complaint will result in the dismissal of the complaint and termination of the action. The remaining Defendant, H SBC Bank, USA, shall answer or seek a pre-motion conference on any potential motion to dismiss by June 20, 2018. An in-person Initial Pre-trial Conference is scheduled for June 29, 2018, at 12:00 p.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 218, White Plains, New York 10601. The parties shall confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) at least 21 days prior to the conference and attempt in good faith to agree upon a proposed discovery plan that will ensure trial readiness within six months of the conference date. The parties shall also complete an amended Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and bring it to the conference. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/22/2018) (ras)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION & ORDER: On July 11, 2017, Plaintiff submitted to the Court an Order to Show Cause for Default Judgment against Defendant Prudential Rand Realty, Inc. ("Prudential"). (See e.g., ECF No. 42.) Although Plaintiff is required to prov ide proof of service of both the Summons and Complaint upon Defendants, he has provided only affirmations of service of the Summons. (ECF No. 10.) Given Plaintiff has not demonstrated that he effectuated proper service upon Prudential, his Order to Show Cause is denied without prejudice to renew at a later date. Plaintiff is directed to present proof of service upon Prudential of both the Summons and Complaint. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/2/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers(rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. HSBC Bank, USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Rand Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All persons and entities with an interest in real property located at 4 William Street, Ossining, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?