Turley v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Turley and Dawn M. Turley
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc, Middletown I Resources L.P. and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2017cv02178
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the claims in this case have been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if settlement is not consummated within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/5/2017) (ras)
October 5, 2017 Mediator Session Held on 09/21/2017 By Telephone Conference.(ms)
September 12, 2017 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/12/2017.(cda)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition (of fact witnesses) due by 12/1/2017. Fact Discovery due by 1/12/2018. Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2018. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/28/2017) (mml)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER...the above-entitled action is eligible for mediation, pursuant to the Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/8/2017. Mediator Expertise Request due by 9/5/2017. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/29/2017) (mml)
August 29, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2017. Case Management Plan is signed. Status Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Mediation Order will be entered. See transcript. (Court Reporter Mary Staten) (aca)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Initial Conference adjourned to 8/29/17 at 9:45 AM. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
July 19, 2017 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated 7/19/17. Document filed by Dawn M. Turley.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Initial Conference is adjourned to 7/26/17 at 3:45 pm. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 12, 2017 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Initial Conference scheduled for June 19, 2017 on Consent addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Eric R. Fish dated June 12, 2017. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Fish, Eric)
May 26, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
May 23, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Fish, Eric)
May 23, 2017 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Fish, Eric)
May 23, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Robert Fish on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Fish, Eric)
May 10, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Dawn M. Turley. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
May 10, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Middletown I Resources L.P. served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, as Authorized Agent of the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Dawn M. Turley. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
March 24, 2017 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Middletown I Resources L.P.. (sj)
March 24, 2017 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (sj)
March 24, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 24, 2017 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. (sj)
March 24, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
March 24, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MIDDLETOWN I RESOURCES L.P., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dawn M. Turley. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
March 24, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dawn M. Turley. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
March 24, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
March 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohls Department Stores, Inc., Middletown I Resources L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13465724)Document filed by Dawn M. Turley.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middletown I Resources L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Robert Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Turley
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?