Lowell v. Lyft, Inc.
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2017cv06251
Filed: August 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 110 Letter Motion to Seal; granting 111 Letter Motion for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021., 111 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremi ah, 112 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021. addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah ( Status Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.); granting 112 Letter Motion for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021., 111 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021. addr essed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah, 112 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 110 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah Frei-Pearson dated August 23, 2021. < i> addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jeremiah ( Status Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.) Plaintiff's letter motion for leave to file certain materials under seal (ECF No. 110) is GRA NTED, and the Court accepts the redacted versions of Plaintiffs' letter regarding ripe discovery disputes and the confidential exhibit filed on August 23, 2021 as the public versions of these filings. Defendant must respond to Plaintiffs' l etter on or before August 30, 2021. The Court will address these disputes at the conference currently scheduled for September 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. ET. The parties should be prepared to present substantive argument on these issues at that conference, and the Court is likely to resolve the disputes on the record at that time. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 8/25/21) (yv)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FIFTH AMENDED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting 106 Letter Motion for Discovery. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U. S.C. § 636(c). Non-expert depositions shall be completed by September 30, 2021. Expert depositions shall be completed by February 18, 2022. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY February 18, 2022. The next case management conference is scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 11:00 AM. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 106. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 5/13/2021) (rro)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: This matter has recently been reassigned to me. Due to the extension of discovery deadlines and further proceedings before Magistrate Judge Smith, the case management conference previously scheduled for May 8, 2020 is hereby cancelled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/30/2020) (ks)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION & ORDER re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Lyft, Inc.., For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's moti on to dismiss Plaintiffs' NYCHRL claim is GRANTED and Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff WDOMI's NYSHRL claim is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' ADA claims and Plaintiff Lowell's NYSHRL claim is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 31. Defendant shall file its answer on or before December 20, 2018. The parties are directed to appear before this Court for an initial pre-trial conferenc e on January 4, 2019 at 10:00 AM. The parties are also directed to confer, complete, and submit to the Court the attached amended case management plan before the initial pre-trial conference. This constitutes the Court's Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED., Lyft, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018., Initial Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/29/2018) (rj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowell v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Kinsler Fidler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Shudofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?