Blair v. Molinari
Plaintiff: Thomas Blair
Defendant: Albert Molinari
Case Number: 7:2017cv08455
Filed: November 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: The parties are directed to provide an update regarding the status of the above-captioned case by January 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/05/2021) (ama)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: TO ALL PARTIES: The conference scheduled for June 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned will be conducted via AT&T Teleconferencing Service. Counsel shall call the following number at the time of the conference: Toll-Free Number: 877-873-8017 Access Code: 4264138. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/27/2020) (jca)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. During a telephone conference on February 10, 2020, this Court scheduled a telephone conference for April 13, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for defendant did not appear at the April 13, 2020 conference, nor did she contact the Court to request an adjournment or otherwise notify the Court of an inability to attend the conference. Accordingly, counsel for defendant shall submit a letter to the Court by close of business April 17, 2020 explaining in writing her failure to appear on April 13, 20 20. Furthermore, all counsel shall participate in a telephone conference on June 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall have all parties on the line before contacting Chambers. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 4/13/2020) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Blair
Represented By: Michael Atwater Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Molinari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?