Patterson v. Diggs et al
Plaintiff: Warren W Patterson
Defendant: Robert Diggs, Darryl Hill, Dennis Coles, Gary Grice, Jason Hunter, Elgin Turner, Clifford Smith, Corey Woods, Lamont Jody Hawkins, Tarik Azzougarh and Paddle8 NY LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv03142
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by October 16, 2020, counsel for plaintiff shall file the status letter. SO-ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/14/2020) (jca)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff and Corey Woods, defendant pro se, appeared by telephone today for a case management telephone conference. A status letter concerning the parties' efforts to settle the case is due by 6/5/20. Plaintiff is direct ed to file the status letter via ECF and provide a copy to defendant Woods. With respect to plaintiff's request to enter a default judgment against Paddle 8, Inc., the application previously made was terminated by the Clerk's Office, an d as such, there is no motion or other application pending before this Court. Plaintiff is directed to comply with my Individual Practices and file his motion for a default judgment in accordance therewith, specifically Attachment A. Counsel for Plaintiff is instructed to deliver a copy of this Order to defendant Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/28/2020) (ks)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY PRO SE DEFENDANT COREY WOODS AND PROVIDE HIM WITH THE TOLL-FREE NUMBER AND ACCESS CODE. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/31/2020) (ks)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Corey Woods' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, without prejudice to the subsequent filing of a summary judgment motion. The motion is granted with respect to Plaintif f's Lanham Act claims, which comprise the sixth and seventh causes of action in the Amended Complaint, and those claims are dismissed. The motion is denied with respect to Plaintiff's claims sounding in direct copyright infringement, vio lation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act, vicarious copyright infringement, and contributory infringement. Defendant Corey Woods is directed to file his answer with respect to Plaintiff's surviving claims on or before September 13, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 75, mail a copy of this Opinion to Defendant Corey Woods, and file proof of service on the docket. SO ORDERED. Corey Woods answer due 9/13/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/23/2019) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Diggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elgin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamont Jody Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarik Azzougarh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paddle8 NY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren W Patterson
Represented By: Anthony Michael Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?