Suchocky v. Harter A Jami Company et al
Plaintiff: Mr Williams M. Suchocky and William Suchocky
Defendant: HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, HARTER A JAMI COMPANY, JAMI, INC., HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, D/B/A HARTER CORPORATION, JSJ CORPORATION and JSJ FURNITURE CORP.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: JSJ Furniture Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: Techne Seating Components
Case Number: 7:2018cv06449
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 9/4/2018. By October 19, 2018, the parties are to submit a joint status letter to the Court regarding progress of settlement talks and service on Third-party in Canada. Plaintiff's counsel directed by Court to file a Notice of Appearance. See transcript. (Court Reporter Sabrina D'Emidio) (wc)
August 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ellen H. Greiper. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TECHNE SEATING COMPONENTS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pc)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TECHNE SEATING COMPONENTS.Document filed by JSJ Furniture Corporation.(Greiper, Ellen)
August 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ellen H. Greiper to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Third Party Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Third Party Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ellen H. Greiper. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JSJ Furniture Corp., TECHNE SEATING COMPONENTS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against JSJ Furniture Corp., TECHNE SEATING COMPONENTS.Document filed by JSJ Furniture Corp..(Greiper, Ellen) Modified on 8/9/2018 (vf).
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
August 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Greiper, Ellen)
July 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ellen H. Greiper. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Harter A Jami Company, Harter Chair Corporation, Harter Chair Corporation, Jami, Inc., JSJ Furniture Corp., JSJ Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was entered incorrectly. (pne)
July 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ellen H. Greiper to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibits are clear. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
July 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ellen H. Greiper to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; No Courthouse Assignment selected on civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ellen H. Greiper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Other Court Name None; Other Court Number None; Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); Jury Demand code d (Defendant); County code New York. The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Other Court Name has been modified to State Court - Supreme; the Other Court Number has been modified to 031339-2018; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
July 25, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 25, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 25, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Harter Chair Corporation, Harter A Jami Company, Harter Chair Corporation, JSJ Corporation, JSJ Furniture Corp., Jami, Inc..(Greiper, Ellen)
July 18, 2018 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0208-15338925.(Greiper, Ellen)
July 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Ellen H. Greiper. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018. (pne)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by HARTER A JAMI COMPANY, HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, D/B/A HARTER CORPORATION, JAMI, INC., JSJ CORPORATION, JSJ FURNITURE CORP..(Greiper, Ellen)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of KINGS. Case Number: 031339/2018..Document filed by JSJ FURNITURE CORP., HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, D/B/A HARTER CORPORATION, HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, JSJ CORPORATION, HARTER A JAMI COMPANY, JAMI, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C)(Greiper, Ellen) Modified on 7/25/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suchocky v. Harter A Jami Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Williams M. Suchocky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Suchocky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTER A JAMI COMPANY
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMI, INC.
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTER CHAIR CORPORATION, D/B/A HARTER CORPORATION
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSJ CORPORATION
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSJ FURNITURE CORP.
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JSJ Furniture Corporation
Represented By: Ellen H. Greiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Techne Seating Components
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?