Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mazzelli et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Diana Martinez and Julie Mazzelli
Case Number: 7:2018cv07521
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diana Martinez, Julie Mazzelli. (pc)
August 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Stephen John Vargas to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury demand was not selected. (pc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen) Modified on 8/20/2018 (pc).
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Vargas, Stephen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julie Mazzilli: Diana Martinez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diana Martinez, Julie Mazzelli. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15466563)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mazzelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Mazzelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?