Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Pogue et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Stephen W. Pogue, Capital Communications Federal Credit Union and Iris Pogue
Case Number: 7:2018cv08139
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332df
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Iris Pogue. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Vargas, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Capital Communications Federal Credit Union served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. Service was accepted by Tim Ortwein, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Vargas, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Stephen W. Pogue served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. Service was accepted by Iris Pogue, Wife. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Vargas, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Iris Pogue served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. Service was accepted by Iris Pogue, Self. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital Communications Federal Credit Union, Iris Pogue, Stephen W. Pogue. (pc)
September 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephen John Vargas. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nationstar Mortgage LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate FIF HE Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate NSM Holdings for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Vargas, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Iris Pogue, Stephen W. Pogue, Capital Communications Federal Credit Union, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Communications Federal Credit Union, Iris Pogue, Stephen W. Pogue. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15537599)Document filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Pogue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Communications Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?