Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Defendant: Sun Dal Kim, Il Whan Kho, Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc. D/B/A Clemente Cleaners, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Illinois), Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2018cv08306
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Berberich, Karen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Berberich, Karen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Il Whan Kho. (dnh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sun Dal Kim. (dnh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc.. (dnh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (dnh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Il Whan Kho, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schaberg, Margriet)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sun Dal Kim, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schaberg, Margriet)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sun Kim Cleaners D/B/A Clemente Cleaners, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schaberg, Margriet)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schaberg, Margriet)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margriet Allynn Schaberg on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Schaberg, Margriet)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Ins. Co., Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Kalik, Lance)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kalik, Lance)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Il Whan Kho, Sun Dal Kim, Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc.. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Kalik, Lance)
September 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lance Jon Kalik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lance Jon Kalik to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; Incorrect Origin Code selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lance Jon Kalik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Illinois), Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc. D/B/A Clemente Cleaners. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted. (pc)
September 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lance Jon Kalik to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15560636)Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalik, Lance) Modified on 9/13/2018 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Represented By: Margriet Allynn Schaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Dal Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Il Whan Kho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc. D/B/A Clemente Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Illinois)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen M Berberich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Kim Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?